EP2563390 - METHODS AND ARTICLES FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING RISK OF DEVELOPING A HYPERALLERGENIC IMMUNE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allovate, LLC 100 West 93rd Street, Unit 15F New York NY 10025 / US | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANCOIS, Cedric 1434 Goddard Avenue Louisville, KY 40204 / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Moore, Michael Richard, et al Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 11775689.0 | 02.05.2011 | WO2011US34741 | Priority number, date | US20100329726P | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 329726 P | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011137422 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563390 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/36 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A61K39/36 (EP,US);
A61J7/0053 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ARTIKEL ZUR VERHINDERUNG ODER REDUZIERUNG DES RISIKOS DER ENTWICKLUNG EINES HYPERALLEGENEN IMMUNSYSTEMS | [2013/10] | English: | METHODS AND ARTICLES FOR PREVENTING OR REDUCING RISK OF DEVELOPING A HYPERALLERGENIC IMMUNE SYSTEM | [2013/10] | French: | PROCÉDES ET ARTICLES DE PRÉVENTION OU DE RÉDUCTION DU RISQUE DE DÉVELOPPEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME IMMUNITAIRE HYPERALLERGÉNIQUE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 14.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 10.07.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/52] | 04.08.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP17179648.5 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0681824 (WIMA KUNSTSTOFF PRODUKTE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,12-15; | [XY]WO9825572 (CROWE D E [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,12-15; | [XY]DE29912596U (CHEN CHEAN SHUI [TW]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,12-15; | [A]DE10137232 (FOSS PIERRE [DE]) [A] 1-3,12-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ESCH R E ET AL, "Sublingual-oral administration of standardized allergenic extracts: phase 1 safety and dosing results", ANNALS OF ALLERGY, ASTHMA & IMMUNOLOGY, ARLINGTON HEIGHTS, IL, US, vol. 100, no. 5, ISSN 1081-1206, (20080501), pages 475 - 481, (20080501), XP026960057 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - MARCUCCI F ET AL, "Effects on inflammation parameters of a double-blind, placebo controlled one-year course of SLIT in children monosensitized to mites.", ALLERGY JUL 2003, (200307), vol. 58, no. 7, ISSN 0105-4538, pages 657 - 662, XP002722732 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1398-9995.2003.00193.x | [Y] - T HIRSCH ET AL, "Double-blind placebo-controlled study of sublingual immunotherapy with house dust mite extract (D.pt.) in children.", PEDIATRIC ALLERGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, DK, (19970201), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1399-3038.1997.tb00138.x, ISSN 0905-6157, pages 21 - 27, XP055111776 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-3038.1997.tb00138.x | [Y] - SKONER D ET AL, "Sublingual immunotherapy in patients with allergic rhinoconjunctivitis caused by ragweed pollen", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 125, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.JACI.2009.12.931, ISSN 0091-6749, (20100301), pages 660 - 666.e4, (20100211), XP026942662 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaci.2009.12.931 | [Y] - TAHAMILER RAUF ET AL, "Long-term efficacy of sublingual immunotherapy in patients with perennial rhinitis.", THE LARYNGOSCOPE JUN 2007, (200706), vol. 117, no. 6, ISSN 0023-852X, pages 965 - 969, XP002722733 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MLG.0b013e31804f8141 | [Y] - MARCUCCI F ET AL, "Sublingual tryptase and ECP in children treated with grass pollen sublingual immunotherapy (SLIT): safety and immunologic implications.", ALLERGY NOV 2001, (200111), vol. 56, no. 11, ISSN 0105-4538, pages 1091 - 1095, XP002722786 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1398-9995.2001.00226.x | [Y] - "[The Nutrition Committee of the Austrian Society of Pediatrics. Antigen-reduced infant nutrition].", PÄDIATRIE UND PÄDOLOGIE 1993, (1993), vol. 28, no. 4, ISSN 0030-9338, pages 93 - 95, XP008168669 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - MASCARELL LAURENT ET AL, "Novel ways for immune intervention in immunotherapy: mucosal allergy vaccines.", IMMUNOLOGY AND ALLERGY CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA MAY 2006, (200605), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0889-8561, page 283, XP008168661 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.iac.2006.02.009 | International search | [Y]WO9517208 (INST CHILD HEALTH RESEARCH OF [AU], et al); | [Y]US5762943 (DOLOVICH JERRY [CA], et al); | [Y]WO2008153761 (MASTCELL PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2009182308 (HAGBI IDAN [IL]) |