Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2608939 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2016 | B1 | EP2608939 | 03.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011EP68570 | 24.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013007646 | 26.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011EP68570 | 24.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112011103080T | 11.07.2013 | T5 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011EP68570 | 24.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2576284T | 06.07.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011EP68570 | 24.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2578333 | 27.03.2016 | C2 | RU2013113228 | 27.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011EP68570 | 24.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012055822 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA201000968 | 25.10.2010 |