Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9084938 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2015 | B2 | US2015015486 | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | US201414503218 | 30.09.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6001542B | Global Dossier | 05.10.2016 | B2 | JP2013545510 | 26.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | WO2011US56031 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103249461B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B | CN103249461 | 14.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | WO2011US56031 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2627420 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | B1 | EP2627420 | 21.08.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | WO2011US56031 | 12.10.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012051351 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2012 | A3 | WO2012051351 | 19.04.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8854298 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | B2 | US2012086631 | 12.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6158406B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016219056 | 22.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US90316110 | 12.10.2010 |