EP2632250 - MURINE MODEL OF INFLAMMATION WITH IL33 N-TERMINAL DOMAIN DELETION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTE-SIERRA, Javier 550 Bloomfield Av 35 Caldwell New Jersey 07006 / US | 02 /
IGLESIAS, Antonio Brombergstrasse 15 79102 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
MEYER, Claas Aiko Lothringerstrasse 37 CH-4056 Basel / CH | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Townsend, Carolin, et al F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 11776153.6 | 26.10.2011 | WO2011EP68696 | Priority number, date | EP20100189446 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: EP 10189446 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055891 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632250 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/85 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A01K67/0275 (EP,KR,US);
A01K67/0276 (US);
A61K49/0008 (US);
C12N15/85 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/10 (KR);
G01N33/502 (US);
G01N33/5088 (US);
A01K2217/077 (KR);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0325 (KR);
A01K2267/035 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0368 (US);
G01N2500/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | MAUSMODELL EINER ENTZÜNDUNG MIT LÖSCHUNG DER IL33 N-TERMINALDOMÄNE | [2013/36] | English: | MURINE MODEL OF INFLAMMATION WITH IL33 N-TERMINAL DOMAIN DELETION | [2013/36] | French: | MODÈLE MURIN D'INFLAMMATION AYANT UNE DÉLÉTION DU DOMAINE N-TERMINAL DE IL33 | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 05.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YDA] - K. OBOKI ET AL, "IL-33 is a crucial amplifier of innate rather than acquired immunity", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20101026), vol. 107, no. 43, doi:10.1073/pnas.1003059107, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 18581 - 18586, XP055016462 [YD] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 9-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1003059107 | [YA] - OBOKI, K et al., "IL-33 is a crucial amplifier of innate rather than acquired immunity. Supporting Information", vol. 107, no. 43, (20101026), URL: http://www.pnas.org/content/suppl/2010/10/05/1003059107.DCSupplemental, (20120117) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 9-13 | [XAY] - V. CARRIERE ET AL, "IL-33, the IL-1-like cytokine ligand for ST2 receptor, is a chromatin-associated nuclear factor in vivo", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20070102), vol. 104, no. 1, doi:10.1073/pnas.0606854104, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 282 - 287, XP055016527 [X] 6,8 * the whole document * [A] 9-13 [Y] 1-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0606854104 | [YA] - LUCIE ROUSSEL ET AL, "Molecular mimicry between IL-33 and KSHV for attachment to chromatin through the H2A-H2B acidic pocket", EMBO REPORTS, (20081001), vol. 9, no. 10, doi:10.1038/embor.2008.145, ISSN 1469-221X, pages 1006 - 1012, XP055016526 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 9-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/embor.2008.145 | [A] - PALMER G ET AL, "The IL-1 receptor accessory protein (AcP) is required for IL-33 signaling and soluble AcP enhances the ability of soluble ST2 to inhibit IL-33", CYTOKINE, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.CYTO.2008.03.008, ISSN 1043-4666, (20080601), pages 358 - 364, (20080502), XP022696634 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cyto.2008.03.008 | [A] - KEISUKE OBOKI ET AL, "IL-33 and IL-33 Receptors in Host Defense and Diseases", ALLERGOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (20100601), vol. 59, no. 2, doi:10.2332/allergolint.10-RAI-0186, ISSN 1323-8930, pages 143 - 160, XP055016756 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2332/allergolint.10-RAI-0186 | [A] - HARALDSEN G ET AL, "Interleukin-33 - cytokine of dual function or novel alarmin?", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US, vol. 30, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.IT.2009.03.003, ISSN 1471-4906, (20090501), pages 227 - 233, (20090407), XP026096302 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2009.03.003 | [A] - CHRISTINE MOUSSION ET AL, "The IL-1-Like Cytokine IL-33 Is Constitutively Expressed in the Nucleus of Endothelial Cells and Epithelial Cells In Vivo: A Novel 'Alarmin'?", PLOS ONE, (20080101), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0003331, ISSN 1932-6203, pages E3331 - E3331, XP055016644 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003331 | [AD] - C. CAYROL ET AL, "The IL-1-like cytokine IL-33 is inactivated after maturation by caspase-1", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20090602), vol. 106, no. 22, doi:10.1073/pnas.0812690106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9021 - 9026, XP055016434 [AD] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0812690106 | by applicant | - OBOKI ET AL., PNAS, (2010), vol. 107, no. 43, pages 18581 - 18586 |