EP2627424 - UNIT FOR ESTABLISHING CONTACT BETWEEN A GAS AND A LIQUID FOR A FLOATING PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total S.A. 2, place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Total S.A. 2, place Jean Millier La Défense 6 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRETIEN, Denis 8 rue Santerre F-75012 Paris / FR | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/34] | Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11776894.5 | 10.10.2011 | [2016/01] | WO2011IB54463 | Priority number, date | FR20100058250 | 11.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058250 | [2013/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012049615 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627424 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2627424 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B01F3/04, F25J3/02, B01D3/16, E21B43/34, B01D3/00, B01D53/18 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
B01D3/008 (EP,US);
B01F23/20 (US);
B01D3/16 (EP,US);
B01D53/18 (US);
B01D53/185 (EP,US);
B01D53/263 (US);
E21B43/34 (EP,US);
F25J3/0295 (EP,US);
B01D2252/2025 (EP,US);
B01D2252/204 (EP,US);
B01D2257/304 (EP,US);
B01D2257/504 (EP,US);
B01D2257/80 (EP,US);
F25J2200/90 (EP,US);
F25J2290/72 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/34] | B01D3/00, B01D3/16, B01D53/18, E21B43/34, F25J3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEIT ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KONTAKTES ZWISCHEN EINEM GAS UND EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR EINE SCHWIMMENDE PLATTFORM | [2013/34] | English: | UNIT FOR ESTABLISHING CONTACT BETWEEN A GAS AND A LIQUID FOR A FLOATING PLATFORM | [2013/34] | French: | INSTALLATION DE MISE EN CONTACT ENTRE UN GAZ ET UN LIQUIDE POUR SUPPORT FLOTTANT | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2011 | AL | 06.01.2016 | AT | 06.01.2016 | CY | 06.01.2016 | CZ | 06.01.2016 | DK | 06.01.2016 | EE | 06.01.2016 | ES | 06.01.2016 | FI | 06.01.2016 | HR | 06.01.2016 | IT | 06.01.2016 | LT | 06.01.2016 | LV | 06.01.2016 | MC | 06.01.2016 | MK | 06.01.2016 | MT | 06.01.2016 | NL | 06.01.2016 | PL | 06.01.2016 | RO | 06.01.2016 | RS | 06.01.2016 | SE | 06.01.2016 | SI | 06.01.2016 | SK | 06.01.2016 | SM | 06.01.2016 | TR | 06.01.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.04.2016 | GR | 07.04.2016 | IS | 06.05.2016 | PT | 06.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 10.10.2011 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
TR | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.10.2011 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
MT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.10.2011 | |
AT | 06.01.2016 | ||
CY | 06.01.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
MC | 06.01.2016 | ||
MK | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SI | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
CZ | 06.01.2016 | ||
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RO | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
SK | 06.01.2016 | ||
SM | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
EE | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
DK | 06.01.2016 | ||
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LV | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
RS | 06.01.2016 | ||
SE | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
IS | 06.05.2016 | ||
PT | 06.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 06.01.2016 | |
ES | 06.01.2016 | ||
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
IT | 06.01.2016 | ||
LT | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
PL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | ES | 06.01.2016 | |
FI | 06.01.2016 | ||
HR | 06.01.2016 | ||
NL | 06.01.2016 | ||
NO | 06.04.2016 | ||
GR | 07.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/30] | NL | 06.01.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004020238 (KALBASSI MOHAMMAD A [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-37 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP1987867 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-14* figures 1-3; claims 1-10 * | by applicant | FR2777533 | US2008271983 |