|
14.12.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2016 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
05.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
02.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.08.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.06.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.03.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |