EP2630590 - IDENTIFIERS FOR STYLE SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monotype Imaging Inc. 500 Unicorn Park Drive Woburn, MA 01801 / US | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Steve, Hsing 1529 Birchmeadow Court San Jose California 95131 / US | 02 /
HARNED, David, S., III 715 Timothy Court East Dundee Illinois 60118 / US | 03 /
YETRINTALA, Venkat 101-3 Driscoll Lane Wood Dale Illinois 60191 / US | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Slingsby Partners LLP 1 Kingsway London WC2B 6AN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 DE-80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11777015.6 | 21.10.2011 | WO2011US57285 | Priority number, date | US20100405481P | 21.10.2010 Original published format: US 405481 P | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012054832 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630590 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
G06F40/154 (EP,US);
G06F40/186 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATOREN FÜR STILVORLAGEN | [2013/35] | English: | IDENTIFIERS FOR STYLE SHEETS | [2013/35] | French: | IDENTIFIANTS POUR FEUILLES DE STYLE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/04] | 18.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2019 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003217076 (HEPTINSTALL CHRISTIAN ELLIOT [US], et al) [X] 1,5-10,14-19,23-27 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 2-4,11-13,20-22 | Examination | US6792577 | - SYAM KUMAR, "How to remove cruft from your apache log", WEBMASTER VIEW, (20091101), URL: http://www.webmasterview.com/2009/11/apache-log-cruft/, (20140619), XP055124245 | by applicant | US19810614054 |