Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014130685 | ![]() | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013188471 | ![]() | 03.04.2014 | A3 | WO2013188471 | 19.12.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013158936 | ![]() | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261655390 | 04.06.2012 | US201261636518 | 20.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013155119 | ![]() | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010053587 | ![]() | 19.08.2010 | A3 | WO2010053587 | 14.05.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2025129420 | ![]() | 24.04.2025 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201816121995 | 05.09.2018 | US202418984757 | 17.12.2024 | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201816218535 | 13.12.2018 | US202117316148 | 10.05.2021 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201715827759 | 30.11.2017 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021310076 | ![]() | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201614987165 | 04.01.2016 | US201816222052 | 17.12.2018 | US202117232961 | 16.04.2021 | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US201715820655 | 22.11.2017 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201414329873 | 11.07.2014 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016230236 | ![]() | 11.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201615133932 | 20.04.2016 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201313908813 | 03.06.2013 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201113100395 | 04.05.2011 | US201161452594 | 14.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015252419 | ![]() | 10.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113196885 | 02.08.2011 | US201113100389 | 04.05.2011 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201514611878 | 02.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015167080 | ![]() | 18.06.2015 | A1 | US9043160 | 26.05.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201113196885 | 02.08.2011 | US201113100389 | 04.05.2011 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9512487 | ![]() | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2015065352 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201414176551 | 10.02.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9228232 | ![]() | 05.01.2016 | B2 | US2014342367 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201414329873 | 11.07.2014 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9523129 | ![]() | 20.12.2016 | B2 | US2014315725 | 23.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414173712 | 05.02.2014 | US201113100389 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014255929 | ![]() | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201414202990 | 10.03.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9416420 | ![]() | 16.08.2016 | B2 | US2014235454 | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014234835 | ![]() | 21.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201414185846 | 20.02.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013344066 | ![]() | 26.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201313905406 | 30.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9394567 | ![]() | 19.07.2016 | B2 | US2013302801 | 14.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201313859210 | 09.04.2013 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9347099 | ![]() | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2013267427 | 10.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201313908813 | 03.06.2013 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201113100395 | 04.05.2011 | US201161452594 | 14.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016355893 | ![]() | 08.12.2016 | A9 | US9506119 | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2013236895 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9365901 | ![]() | 14.06.2016 | B2 | US2013202718 | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313861941 | 12.04.2013 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201261655390 | 04.06.2012 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201261636518 | 20.04.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9528160 | ![]() | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2013196328 | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US44574310 | 25.10.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8628927 | ![]() | 14.01.2014 | B2 | US2013136799 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313763978 | 11.02.2013 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8795970 | ![]() | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013017957 | 17.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213468323 | 10.05.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9217176 | ![]() | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2013005584 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012135409 | ![]() | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113214111 | 19.08.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8507205 | ![]() | 13.08.2013 | B2 | US2011207617 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201113100395 | 04.05.2011 | US201161452594 | 14.03.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8691510 | ![]() | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2011207135 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100389 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8748103 | ![]() | 10.06.2014 | B2 | US2011207134 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8236503 | ![]() | 07.08.2012 | B2 | US2010151471 | 17.06.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12209282 | ![]() | 28.01.2025 | B2 | US2022127675 | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201816121995 | 05.09.2018 | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201816218535 | 13.12.2018 | US202117316148 | 10.05.2021 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201715827759 | 30.11.2017 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11021757 | ![]() | 01.06.2021 | B2 | US2019100810 | 04.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201816218535 | 13.12.2018 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201816121995 | 05.09.2018 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201715827759 | 30.11.2017 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11001895 | ![]() | 11.05.2021 | B2 | US2019169698 | 06.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201614987165 | 04.01.2016 | US201816222052 | 17.12.2018 | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US201715820655 | 22.11.2017 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201414329873 | 11.07.2014 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10865453 | ![]() | 15.12.2020 | B2 | US2019062848 | 28.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201816121995 | 05.09.2018 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201715827759 | 30.11.2017 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10760133 | ![]() | 01.09.2020 | B2 | US2018080090 | 22.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US201715827759 | 30.11.2017 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10519511 | ![]() | 31.12.2019 | B2 | US2017349954 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715618732 | 09.06.2017 | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10266901 | ![]() | 23.04.2019 | B2 | US2016201133 | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201614987165 | 04.01.2016 | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201414329873 | 11.07.2014 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10246752 | ![]() | 02.04.2019 | B2 | US2018112278 | 26.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201614987165 | 04.01.2016 | US201213459701 | 30.04.2012 | US201715820655 | 22.11.2017 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US201414329873 | 11.07.2014 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10155992 | ![]() | 18.12.2018 | B2 | US2018023143 | 25.01.2018 | A9 | US2016251728 | 01.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100365 | 04.05.2011 | US201314075075 | 08.11.2013 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US201161445743 | 23.02.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | US61526309 | 09.11.2009 | US201615061750 | 04.03.2016 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6513035B | ![]() | 15.05.2019 | B2 | JP2016507248 | 10.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US17416 | 20.02.2014 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6112577B | ![]() | 12.04.2017 | B2 | JP2016039800 | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015519081 | ![]() | 09.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015512655 | ![]() | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6085249B | ![]() | 22.02.2017 | B2 | JP2013524849 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | WO2011US00792 | 04.05.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6158080B | ![]() | 05.07.2017 | B2 | JP2013524848 | 20.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5798926B | ![]() | 21.10.2015 | B2 | JP2012508011 | 05.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4335932 | ![]() | 26.06.2024 | A3 | EP4335932 | 13.03.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20157266 | 09.11.2009 | EP13195379 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | EP09764927 | 09.11.2009 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4219759 | ![]() | 06.09.2023 | A3 | EP4219759 | 02.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP16183402 | 04.05.2011 | EP18201137 | 04.05.2011 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | EP11777704 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3699296 | ![]() | 26.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13195379 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | EP09764927 | 09.11.2009 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3456847 | ![]() | 25.12.2024 | C0 | EP3456847 | ![]() | 25.12.2024 | B1 | EP3456847 | 20.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP16183402 | 04.05.2011 | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | EP11777704 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3144673 | ![]() | 10.07.2019 | B1 | EP3144673 | 22.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | EP11777704 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2959020 | ![]() | 18.09.2019 | B1 | EP2959020 | 08.02.2017 | A4 | EP2959020 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US17416 | 20.02.2014 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2859123 | ![]() | 16.12.2015 | A4 | EP2859123 | 15.04.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2836611 | ![]() | 30.12.2015 | A4 | EP2836611 | 18.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2719774 | ![]() | 22.04.2020 | B8 | EP2719774 | 18.03.2020 | B1 | EP2719774 | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | EP09764927 | 09.11.2009 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2364368 | ![]() | 15.01.2014 | B1 | EP2364368 | 14.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104520443 | ![]() | 15.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104395481 | ![]() | 04.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103097888B | ![]() | 09.03.2016 | B | CN103097888 | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2798431 | ![]() | 23.10.2018 | C | CA2798431 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2742380 | ![]() | 29.05.2018 | C | CA2742380 | 14.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014218910 | ![]() | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US17416 | 20.02.2014 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013274366 | ![]() | 22.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013246050B | ![]() | 16.03.2017 | B2 | AU2013246050 | 23.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011249041B | ![]() | 30.10.2014 | B2 | AU2011249041 | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009311588B | ![]() | 28.07.2016 | B2 | AU2009311588 | 14.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2567226 | ![]() | 10.08.2016 | B1 | EP2567226 | 28.08.2013 | A4 | EP2567226 | 13.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2869481 | 17.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2875542 | 19.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2900240 | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US17416 | 20.02.2014 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102272327B | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102272327 | 07.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104195227B | 12.04.2017 | B | CN104195227 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200980153756 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2567226T | 10.10.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3144673T | 09.09.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | EP11777704 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2453066T | 03.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2593614T | 12.12.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2748204T | 13.03.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US17416 | 20.02.2014 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2781754T | 07.09.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2467704 | 24.08.2011 | B | GB2467704 | 11.08.2010 | A | GB201009641D0 | 21.07.2010 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | WO2009US06053 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2477439 | 15.02.2012 | B | GB2477439 | 03.08.2011 | A | GB201105068D0 | 11.05.2011 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | GB201009641 | 09.11.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2483810 | 05.09.2012 | B | GB2483810 | 21.03.2012 | A | GB201120209D0 | 04.01.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201105068 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2488700 | 29.05.2013 | B | GB2488700 | 05.09.2012 | A | GB201209668D0 | 18.07.2012 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201120209 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2497007 | 07.08.2013 | B | GB2497007 | 29.05.2013 | A | GB201300533D0 | 27.02.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201209668 | 09.11.2009 | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201406538V | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US35857 | 09.04.2013 | US201261624002 | 13.04.2012 | US201313834794 | 15.03.2013 | US201361768269 | 22.02.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201407888R | 30.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361776647 | 11.03.2013 | US201361829054 | 30.05.2013 | US201261738277 | 17.12.2012 | WO2013US45276 | 11.06.2013 | US201313835093 | 15.03.2013 | US201261658317 | 11.06.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG185128 | 28.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | WO2011US00791 | 04.05.2011 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG195652 | 30.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11269308 | 07.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011139372 | ![]() | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011139371 | ![]() | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6533272B | ![]() | 19.06.2019 | B2 | JP2018068300 | 10.05.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6246971B | ![]() | 13.12.2017 | B2 | JP2017205112 | 24.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104673899 | ![]() | 03.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2740802T | 06.02.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201503534R | 29.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US45574310 | 25.10.2010 | US33217510 | 06.05.2010 | US201161446822 | 25.02.2011 | Type | ![]() | EP3144673 | EP3456847 | EP4219759 |