EP2566992 - CONTROLLED BUBBLE COLLAPSE MILLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B9 Plasma, Inc. 129 Gaither Drive, Suite 10 Mount Laurel, NJ 08054 / US | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, James, Charles 8 Millhouse Lane Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11777756.5 | 30.03.2011 | WO2011US30610 | Priority number, date | US20100332610P | 07.05.2010 Original published format: US 332610 P | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011139436 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566992 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22B11/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G05B13/024 (EP,US);
G05B15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Title | German: | ERZVERARBEITUNG MIT GESTEUERTER PARTIKELVERKLEINERUNG | [2013/11] | English: | CONTROLLED BUBBLE COLLAPSE MILLING | [2013/11] | French: | BROYAGE À ÉCRASEMENT DE BULLES COMMANDÉ | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 24.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 26.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007089566 (HACKL RALPH P [CA], et al); | [Y]US6663349 (DISCENZO FREDERICK M [US], et al); | [Y]US5947299 (VAZQUEZ BELISARIO SANCHEZ [MX], et al) |