EP2563201 - FLOOR CLEANING TOOL AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 1300 Altura Road, Suite 125 Fort Mill, SC 29708 / US | [2019/50] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Diversey, Inc. 8310 16th Street, M/S 509 P.O. Box 902 Sturtevant, WI 53177-0902 / US | ||
For all designated states Kuzhnini, Josef Othmarstr.20 9500 Wil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUZHNINI, Josef Othmarstr.20 CH-9500 Wil / CH | 02 /
WINDMEISSER, Dieter Hauptstr.19 CH-8269 Fruthwilen / CH | 03 /
BARTSCH, Andre Konstanzerstrasse 55c CH-9512 Rossruti / CH | 04 /
AUERSWALD, Jerry Gustav-Schwab-Strasse 14n D-78467 Konstanz / DE | 05 /
BAHR, Thomas Eichbuhlstrasse 4 CH-9545 Wangi / CH | 06 /
STAGER, Beat Anetswilerstrasse 19 CH-9545 Wangi / CH | 07 /
JAHDE, Phillip Muhlewiesestrasse 9a CH-8355 Aadorf / CH | [2019/24] |
Former [2013/10] | 01 /
KUZHNINI, Josef Othmarstr.20 CH-9500 Wil / CH | ||
02 /
WINDMEISSER, Dieter Hauptstr.19 CH-8269 Fruthwilen / CH | |||
03 /
BARTSCH, Andre Konstanzerstrasse 55c CH-9512 Rossruti / CH | |||
04 /
AUERSWALD, Jerry Gustav-schwab Str .14n D-78467 Konstanz / DE | |||
05 /
BAHR, Thomas Eichbuhlstrasse 4 CH-9545 Wangi / CH | |||
06 /
STAGER, Beat Anetswilerstrasse 19 CH-9545 Wangi / CH | |||
07 /
JAHDE, Phillip Muhlewiesestrasse 9a CH-8355 Aadorf / CH | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2019/24] |
Former [2013/10] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11778002.3 | 28.04.2011 | [2019/24] | WO2011US34299 | Priority number, date | US20100329184P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 329184 P | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011139825 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563201 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563201 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/34, A47L9/00, A47L11/40 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A47L11/302 (EP,US);
A47L9/0455 (US);
A47L11/19 (US);
A47L11/4041 (EP,US);
A47L11/4044 (EP,US);
A47L11/4075 (EP,US);
A47L11/4077 (EP,US);
A47L11/408 (EP);
A47L11/4088 (EP,US);
A47L9/0477 (US);
B05B1/202 (US);
A47L11/18 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | A47L11/34, A47L9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENREINIGUNGSWERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/10] | English: | FLOOR CLEANING TOOL AND METHOD | [2013/10] | French: | OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE NETTOYAGE DES SOLS | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 18.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19172808.8 / EP3539439 | EP22177273.4 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2011 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.04.2011 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4063961 (HOWARD LAWRENCE F, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 5-60; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9319659 (RACINE IND INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * pages 5-10 *; | [I]DE19607368 (PERDOLT GOTTFRIED [AT]) [I] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19728441 (KAERCHER GMBH & CO ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [X]WO2005032735 (ELECTROLUX HOME CARE PROD NA [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 22, line 24 - page 34, line 6; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US2006156509 (LUEBBERING GREGORY W [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] - [0012] * | International search | [A]JPH05300855 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS); | [X]JPH09168493 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD); | [Y]EP0951858 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]JP2004049619 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [Y]JP2004113263 (AMANO CORP); | [Y]KR20050094963 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]); | [X]WO2006078580 (ELECTROLUX HOME CARE PROD NA [US]); | [A]US2007074369 (STUTHERS BILLY J [US], et al) |