EP2566415 - THERAPEUTIC AGENT DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCALIZED APPLICATION OF THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCES TO A BIOLOGICAL LUMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardiovascular Systems, Inc. 651 Campus Drive St. Paul, MN 55112 / US | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAMBRONNE, Matthew, David 4271 Northbrook Blvd. N. Stillwater Minnesota 55082 / US | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11778130.2 | 03.05.2011 | WO2011US34882 | Priority number, date | US201113098695 | 02.05.2011 Original published format: US201113098695 | US20100330617P | 03.05.2010 Original published format: US 330617 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/11] | US20110098695 | 02.05.2011 | |
US20100330617P | 03.05.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011140006 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566415 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,US);
A61M2025/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERABREICHUNG EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN MITTELS ZUR LOKALEN ANWENDUNG THERAPEUTISCHER SUBSTANZEN IN EIN BIOLOGISCHES LUMEN | [2013/11] | English: | THERAPEUTIC AGENT DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR LOCALIZED APPLICATION OF THERAPEUTIC SUBSTANCES TO A BIOLOGICAL LUMEN | [2013/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION D'AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES POUR UNE APPLICATION LOCALISÉE DE SUBSTANCES THÉRAPEUTIQUES À UNE LUMIÈRE BIOLOGIQUE | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 05.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006271168 (KLEINE ET AL); | [Y]US2010023108 (TONER ET AL); | [A]US2006287709 (RAO) |