EP2567316 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING APPLICATION DEPENDENCY PATHS IN A DATA CENTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/51] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states NEC Laboratories America, Inc. 4 Independence Way, Suite 200 Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Min 1211 Sage Lane Chalfont Pennsylvania 18914 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Vishal 1514 Hunters Glen Drive Plainsboro New Jersey 08536 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yueping 95 Harvard Circle Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | 04 /
JIANG, Guofei 5 Danby Court Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/11] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11778318.3 | 05.05.2011 | [2015/51] | WO2011US35288 | Priority number, date | US201113100805 | 04.05.2011 Original published format: US201113100805 | US20100331962P | 06.05.2010 Original published format: US 331962 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/11] | US20110100805 | 04.05.2011 | |
US20100331962P | 06.05.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011140293 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2567316 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2567316 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.03.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F15/16, H04L12/26, H04L12/24, G06F9/54, G06F11/30 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
G06F11/3006 (EP,US);
G06F11/302 (EP,US);
G06F11/3051 (EP,US);
G06F9/54 (EP,US);
H04L41/046 (EP,US);
H04L43/0876 (EP,US);
H04L43/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/11] | G06F9/44, G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON ANWENDUNGSABHÄNGIGKEITSPFADEN IN EINEM DATENZENTRUM | [2013/11] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING APPLICATION DEPENDENCY PATHS IN A DATA CENTER | [2013/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE CHEMINS DE DÉPENDANCE D'APPLICATIONS DANS UN CENTRE DE DONNÉES | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 25.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.05.2011 | AL | 16.12.2015 | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | RS | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | IE | 05.05.2016 | LU | 05.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.05.2011 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.05.2011 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.05.2011 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.05.2011 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
IE | 05.05.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
LU | 05.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7590715 (RAANAN GIL [IL]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 33 - column 8, line 11; figures 2,3,7,10 *; | [A]US2009070280 (BEYGELZIMER ALINA [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1,2 *; | [A] - XU CHEN MING ZHANG Z MORLEY MAO PARAMVIR BAHL MICROSOFT RESEARCH UNIVERSITY OF MICHIGAN, "Automating Network Application Dependency Discovery: Experiences, Limitations, and New Solutions", USENIX,, (20081114), pages 1 - 14, XP061010879 [A] 1-16 * page 117, column L, line 1 - page 130, column R, line 5 * | [A] - PARAMVIR BAHL ET AL, "Towards highly reliable enterprise network services via inference of multi-level dependencies", ACM SIGCOMM COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, (20071001), vol. 37, no. 4, doi:10.1145/1282427.1282383, ISSN 0146-4833, page 13, XP055153999 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1282427.1282383 | [A] - LEE D ET AL, Algorithms for Non-negative Matrix Factorisation, ADVANCES IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, MIT PRESS, US, PAGE(S) 556 - 562, (20011101), ISBN 978-0-262-56145-7, XP008122934 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [T] - MIN DING ET AL, "Application dependency discovery using matrix factorization", QUALITY OF SERVICE (IWQOS), 2012 IEEE 20TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, (20120604), doi:10.1109/IWQOS.2012.6245965, ISBN 978-1-4673-1296-7, pages 1 - 4, XP032207346 [T] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IWQoS.2012.6245965 | International search | [A]WO2009096970 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al); | [A]US7490317 (HAHN STEPHEN C [US], et al); | [A]US2010037211 (ZAKONOV ALEX [US], et al); | [A]US2007006323 (VERBOWSKI CHAD E [US], et al) | by applicant | US7590715 | US2009070280 | WO2009096970 | - XU CHEN; MING ZHANG; Z MORLEY; MAO PARAMVIR BAHL, "Automating Network Application Dependency Discovery: Experiences, Limitations, and New Solutions", USENIX, (20081114), pages 1 - 14, XP061010879 | - PARAMVIR BAHL ET AL., "Towards highly reliable enterprise network services via inference of multi-level dependencies", ACM SIGCOMM COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, (20071001), vol. 37, doi:doi:10.1145/1282427.1282383, page 13, XP055153999 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1282427.1282383 | - "Algorithms for Non-negative Matrix Factorisation", LEE D ET AL., ADVANCES IN NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS, MIT PRESS, (20011101), pages 556 - 562 |