|
27.01.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.10.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2015 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
12.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2014 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2013 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.03.2013 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.07.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.07.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.03.2012 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.02.2012 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
15.02.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
36 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Priority document (RO-procedure) |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |