EP2638570 - ADHESIVE COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Strasse 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | ||
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Tesa SE Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEN, Alexander Am Güsgensberg 2 53175 Bonn / DE | 02 /
KRAWINKEL, Thorsten Burgwedelkamp 25 22457 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
KEITE-TELGENBÜSCHER, Klaus Emil-Andresen-Str. 35 22529 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
GRÜNAUER, Judith Billstedter Hauptstrasse 78 22117 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
ELLINGER, Jan Müggenkampstraße 1 20257 Hamburg / DE | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/38] | 01 /
STEEN, Alexander Am Güsgensberg 2 53175 Bonn / DE | ||
02 /
KRAWINKEL, Thorsten Burgwedelkamp 25 22457 Hamburg / DE | |||
03 /
KEITE-TELGENBÜSCHER, Klaus Emil-Andresen-Str. 35 22529 Hamburg / DE | |||
04 /
GRÜNAUER, Judith Am Diebsteich 1A 22761 Hamburg / DE | |||
05 /
ELLINGER, Jan Müggenkampstraße 1 20257 Hamburg / DE | Representative(s) | tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11779147.5 | 27.10.2011 | WO2011EP68822 | Priority number, date | DE20101043871 | 12.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043871 | [2013/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062587 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638570 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/29, C09J109/06, C09J153/00 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
C09J109/06 (EP,KR);
C09J153/00 (KR);
C09J153/005 (EP);
H01L23/28 (KR);
H01L23/293 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L2924/12044 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | KLEBMASSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR KAPSELUNG EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN ANORDNUNG | [2013/38] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOUND AND METHOD FOR ENCAPSULATING AN ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY | [2013/38] | French: | ADHÉSIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENCAPSULATION D'UN SYSTÈME ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 15.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 01.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2023 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]WO0146320 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10 * examples 2, 3 * [A] 3 [Y] 6; | [A]EP1114845 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0031]; claim 17 *; | [YA]EP1921111 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 37] * [A] 1-5,7-10; | [A]DE102008062130 (TESA SE [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0088] *; | [XP]WO2011018356 (TESA SE [DE], et al) [XP] 1-4,7-10 * claims 5, 11, 25 * * page 23, lines 6-7 * | by applicant | US4051195 | US4552604 | US5304419 | US5591379 | EP0827994 | WO9821287 | EP1037192 | JP2000311782 | WO03065470 | JP2004296381 | US2004225025 | US6833668 | US2006100299 | WO2007087281 | DE102008047964 | - A.G. ERLAT, 47TH ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS-SOCIETY OF VACUUM COATERS, (2004), pages 654 - 659 | - M. E. GROSS ET AL., 46TH ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS-SOCIETY OF VACUUM COATERS, (2003), pages 89 - 92 |