EP2637841 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL PREFORM DURING THE PRODUCTION OF FIBER-REINFORCED MOLDED PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dieffenbacher GmbH Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Heilbronner Strasse 20 75031 Eppingen / DE | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Matthias Dr.-Alfred-Neff-Str. 2/1 75015 Bretten / DE | [2013/38] | Application number, filing date | 11779464.4 | 09.11.2011 | WO2011EP69785 | Priority number, date | DE20101043666 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043666 | [2013/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062828 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2637841 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/46, B29B11/16 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
B29C70/46 (EP,US);
B29B11/16 (EP);
B29C70/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DREIDIMENSIONALEN VORFORMLINGS IM ZUGE DER HERSTELLUNG VON FASERVERSTÄRKTEN FORMTEILEN | [2013/38] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A THREE-DIMENSIONAL PREFORM DURING THE PRODUCTION OF FIBER-REINFORCED MOLDED PARTS | [2013/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE PRÉFORME TRIDIMENSIONNELLE DANS LE CADRE DE LA FABRICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS MOULÉS RENFORCÉS DE FIBRES | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/26] | 20.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2338650 (PRES TOCK GMBH & CO ENTWICKLUN) [X] 1-3,14 * page 1 - page 4 * * figures 1-5 *[I] 7; | [XI]DE2701480 (KISS CONSULTING ENG) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11-20 * claims 1,2,8,9 * [I] 4,10; | [XI]DE3319391 (KISS G H) [X] 1-4,9,14-20 * claims 1,3,6,8,10 * * page 12, line 6 - line 25 * * page 13, line 24 - page 14, line 24 * * page 16, line 1 - line 12 * * figures 5,6,7 * [I] 5-7,10; | [XI]JP2007283586 (TOYOTA IND CORP) [X] 1-3,9,15,20 * abstract * * figure 5 * [I] 7 | by applicant | EP0620091 |