Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013072400 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011ES70346 | 13.05.2011 | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2799359 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2019 | C | CA2799359 | 17.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011ES70346 | 13.05.2011 | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011251854B | Global Dossier | 17.12.2015 | B2 | AU2011251854 | 06.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011ES70346 | 13.05.2011 | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2570813 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2020 | B1 | EP2570813 | 11.12.2013 | A4 | EP2570813 | 20.03.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011ES70346 | 13.05.2011 | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2819055T | 14.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011ES70346 | 13.05.2011 | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011141612 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2012 | A3 | WO2011141612 | 17.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES201030708 | 13.05.2010 |