EP2568898 - POLYAXIAL BONE SCREW ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jackson, Roger P. 2750 Clay Edwards Drive, Suite 600 North Kansas City, MO 64116-3250 / US | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIMM, Jens, Peter 297 Acacia Avenue D Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Powell, Stephen David Williams Powell 44 Prospect Place Bromley, Kent BR2 9HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Powell, Stephen David Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings London, WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11780926.9 | 12.05.2011 | WO2011US00845 | Priority number, date | US20100800314 | 12.05.2010 Original published format: US 800314 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011142828 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2568898 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/70 (KR);
A61B17/86 (KR);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | MEHRACHSIGE KNOCHENSCHRAUBENANORDNUNG | [2013/12] | English: | POLYAXIAL BONE SCREW ASSEMBLY | [2013/12] | French: | ENSEMBLE VIS À OS POLYAXIALE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 05.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6113601 (TATAR STEPHEN [US]) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2007167948 (ABDOU M S [US]) [X] 1,5-7,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0035]; figures 4A-5B *; | [X]US2008161859 (NILSSON CARL MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0061]; figures 3A,3B,4A,4B *; | [X]US2008269809 (GARAMSZEGI LASZLO [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0028] - [0061]; figures 3-8 *; | [I]US2009198280 (SPRATT FRANK [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2008009862 (HOFFMAN ZACHARY M [US]); | [A]US2008140136 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]); | [X]US2009198280 (SPRATT FRANK [CH], et al) | by applicant | US6726689 | US7377923 | US20080290244 |