EP2569746 - TARGETED MARKETING WITH CPE BUYDOWN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Segmint Inc. 1 Cascade Plaza Suite 1800 Akron, Ohio 44308 / US | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEISER, Russel, Robert, II 3204 Hollybrook Lane Mogadore OH 44260 / US | 02 /
SHAHAN, Nathan, W. 443 Lisbon Drive Tallmadge OH 44278 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11781113.3 | 10.05.2011 | WO2011US35850 | Priority number, date | US20100332933P | 10.05.2010 Original published format: US 332933 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143166 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569746 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06F17/30, G06Q20/38 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
G06Q20/387 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0251 (US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0211 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | GEZIELTES MARKETING MIT CPE-BUYDOWN | [2013/12] | English: | TARGETED MARKETING WITH CPE BUYDOWN | [2013/12] | French: | MARKETING CIBLÉ AVEC ACHAT DE RÉDUCTION DU COÛT PAR ÉVÉNEMENT | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2022 | 12.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/11] | 10.11.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2004267611 (HOERENZ CHRIS P [US]); | [Y]US2005060227 (NELSON ROBERT W [US]); | [A]US2006004628 (AXE BRIAN [US], et al); | [A]US2006242013 (AGARWAL SUMIT [US], et al) |