EP2569097 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states E.I. Du Pont De Nemours And Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA, Ayumu 404 N. Providence Road Media, Pennsylvania 19063 / US | 02 /
BELL, Irving, D. 1232 Whitewood Way West Chester Pennsylvania 19382 / US | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/12] | DuPont Performance Coatings Biering/Blum/Kimpel Christbusch 25 42285 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 11781187.7 | 11.05.2011 | WO2011US36002 | Priority number, date | US20100333396P | 11.05.2010 Original published format: US 333396 P | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011143277 | Date: | 17.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569097 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/36 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B05D7/532 (EP);
B05D7/542 (US);
B05D5/02 (US);
B05D7/14 (US);
B05D7/16 (US);
C09D7/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN BESCHICHTUNG | [2013/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING MULTI-LAYER COATING | [2013/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE UN REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 29.06.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 23.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002052451 (VANDEVOORDE PAUL MARIE [BE], et al); | [Y]US2003091833 (BAUMGART HUBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US6649688 (MAYER BERND [DE], et al); | [Y]US2006222875 (SORMANI PATRICIA MARY E [US], et al); | [X]US2007088102 (KNOUSE DONNA J [US]) |