EP2635449 - PARTIALLY ADHERED FLEXIBLE AXLE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 Quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Renault S.A.S. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHONT, Sébastien 3 avenue du Lac F-72650 La Bazoge / FR | 02 /
DUBE, Emmanuel 1 allée des Cordiers F-72220 Laigne-en-Belin / FR | 03 /
PATIGNIEZ, Alain 4 rue de la Paix F-72380 Sainte-Jamme-sur-Sarthe / FR | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 11781510.0 | 04.11.2011 | WO2011EP69470 | Priority number, date | FR20100059171 | 05.11.2010 Original published format: FR 1059171 | [2013/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012059597 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635449 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635449 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/05, B60B35/02, B62D65/02, F16B11/00, F16B7/04 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
B60B35/004 (EP,US);
B60B35/007 (EP,US);
B60G21/051 (EP,US);
B62D65/12 (US);
B60G2204/1226 (EP,US);
B60G2204/43 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4307 (EP,US);
B60G2204/44 (EP,US);
B60G2206/20 (EP,US);
B60G2206/201 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8207 (EP,US);
B60G2206/821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILHAFTENDE FLEXIBLE ACHSE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2013/37] | English: | PARTIALLY ADHERED FLEXIBLE AXLE FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2013/37] | French: | ESSIEU SOUPLE POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE EN PARTIE COLLE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 10.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2011 | AL | 20.08.2014 | AT | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | RS | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | IE | 04.11.2014 | LU | 04.11.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | BE | 30.11.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.11.2011 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
IE | 04.11.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
LU | 04.11.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3636878 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,2,4-13 * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 45; figures 1,2,5; claims 1,5 *; | [AD]US5800024 (STEIMMEL FRANZ [DE], et al) [AD] 1-4,7,8,13 * column 4, lines 25-33; figures 26-29 *; | [AD]EP1036680 (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-4,7,8,13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006042988 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2944736 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1,2,7,8,13 * page 2, line 13 - line 15; figure -; claims 1,3 * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 2 * * page 5, line 16 - line 21 *; | [AD]DE19542523 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE]) [AD] 1,7,8,13 * column 1, line 45 - column 3, line 13; figure - *; | [A]WO2008055958 (RENAULT SA [FR], et al) [A] 1,7,8,13 * figure -; claim 8 *; | [A]FR2888559 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1,7,8,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP2078870 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5800024 | DE19542523 | DE19752347 | EP1036680 |