EP2632810 - RELEASABLY CLOSABLE PRODUCT ACCOMMODATING PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intercontinental Great Brands LLC 100 Deforest Avenue East Hanover, NJ 07936 / US | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Kraft Foods Global Brands LLC Three Lakes Drive Northfield, IL 60093 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARK, Kerri 7 Valley View Street Morristown NJ 07960 / US | 02 /
HAWTHORNE, Brian 215 West Washington Avenue Apt 2606 Chicago IL 60606 / US | 03 /
RODRIGUEZ, Maximiliano 340 West Summit Street Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 04 /
ALDRIDGE, Allen, Sydney 367 Turrell Avenue South Orange NJ 07079 / US | 05 /
GAINEY, Simon, Richard 210 Woodward Road Media PA 19063 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [2015/33] |
Former [2013/36] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham West Midlands B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11781923.5 | 27.10.2011 | [2015/33] | WO2011US57982 | Priority number, date | US20100407385P | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 407385 P | US20100408091P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 408091 P | US20100408112P | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 408112 P | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012058367 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2632810 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2632810 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/00, B65D85/60, B65D5/42, B65D5/64, B65D77/00 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
B65D5/0085 (EP,CN,US);
B65D77/006 (EP,CN,US);
B65D5/427 (US);
B65D5/643 (US);
B65D85/60 (EP,CN,US);
B65D2313/04 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | B65D5/00, B65D85/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSBAR VERSCHLIESSBARE VERPACKUNG ZUR AUFNAHME EINES PRODUKTES | [2013/36] | English: | RELEASABLY CLOSABLE PRODUCT ACCOMMODATING PACKAGE | [2013/36] | French: | PAQUET QUI CONTIENT DES PRODUITS ET QUI PEUT ÊTRE FERMÉ DE FAÇON LIBÉRABLE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 29.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15171458.1 / EP2947021 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2011 | AL | 12.08.2015 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | MT | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | RS | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | IE | 27.10.2015 | LU | 27.10.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 27.10.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.10.2011 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MT | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
IE | 27.10.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
LU | 27.10.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2043987 (SIEMCO SA) [X] 1-4 * page 2 - page 4; figures 1-4 * | Examination | US1805371 | WO2008153954 | by applicant | US7159717 | US7533773 | US2011054119 | US19850614073 | US19910614080 | US20120614081 |