EP2633099 - AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR PRETREATING A METAL SURFACE BEFORE APPLYING ANOTHER COATING OR FOR TREATING SAID SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUKEIKHANOVA, Saule Beethovenstraße 6 60325 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
KOMANDER, Mathias Theodor-Heuss-Str. 58 63225 Lange / DE | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2013/36] | Rottmayer, Hans Patente, Marken & Lizenzen c/o Chemetall GmbH Trakehner Strasse 3 60487 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 11782079.5 | 26.10.2011 | [2019/27] | WO2011EP68742 | Priority number, date | DE20101043002 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010043002 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055908 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633099 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633099 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/48, C23C22/53, C23C22/56, C23C22/68, C23C22/74, C23C22/83, C23C22/60, C23C22/66, C09D1/04, C09D5/08 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
C09D5/08 (EP,KR,US);
C23C22/48 (KR);
C23F11/182 (US);
C09D1/04 (KR);
C09D183/04 (EP,US);
C09J183/04 (EP,US);
C23C22/53 (KR);
C23C22/56 (KR);
C23C22/60 (EP,US);
C23C22/66 (EP,US);
C23C22/68 (EP,US);
C23C22/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSERIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEHANDLUNG EINER METALLISCHEN OBERFLÄCHE VOR EINER WEITEREN BESCHICHTUNG ODER ZUR BEHANDLUNG JENER OBERFLÄCHE | [2013/36] | English: | AQUEOUS COMPOSITION FOR PRETREATING A METAL SURFACE BEFORE APPLYING ANOTHER COATING OR FOR TREATING SAID SURFACE | [2013/36] | French: | COMPOSITION AQUEUSE POUR LE PRÉTRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE MÉTALLIQUE AVANT UN AUTRE REVÊTEMENT OU POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE CETTE SURFACE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | 10.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2011 | AL | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | AT | 26.10.2019 | GB | 26.10.2019 | IE | 26.10.2019 | LU | 26.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | CH | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | LI | 31.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | DE | 01.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
GB | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
GB | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
GB | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
GB | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
GB | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2019 | ||
LI | 31.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | JPS5250940 [ ]; | [XI]JPS5250940 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [I] 4; | [XI]US4828616 (YAMASOE KATSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8,13,14,17-20 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 21 * * column 3, line 25 - line 44 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 45 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 5 * * examples 3, 2*; table 1 * [I] 4; | [X]EP0648823 (BETZ EUROP INC [US]) [X] 1,5-7,13-15,17-20 * page 1, lines 1-4, 23-57 * * page 2, line 1 - line 37 * * example 1; table I * * example 2; table II * * example 3; tables III, 4% Sample 1 * * example 5 *; | [X]US5415688 (GASMENA ROLAND L [US], et al) [X] 1-8,13,14,17-20 * column 1, lines 6-12 * * column 3, line 15 - line 65 * * column 6, line 19 - line 60 * * column 11, line 62 - column 12, line 62 * * examples 1, 4, 7, 8, 10-15, 17-20; table 1 *; | [XI]US5451431 (PURNELL DEBORAH L [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,13-20 * column 1, lines 10-23, 55-62 * * column 2, lines 6-26 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 4 * * example 6; tables VI D,F,G,H,I,J,K,L,M,N,O,P,Q,R,S,T * * example 8; table VIII * [I] 4; | [XI]WO2007075050 (POSCO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,13,14,17-20 * page 3, paragraph 10 - paragraph 12 * * page 4, paragraph 17 - page 6, paragraph 27 * * page 11, paragraph 61 - page 13, paragraph 86; example 1; table 2 * [I] 4; | [XI]EP2223975 (DIPSOL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8,13,14,17-20 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 11 - page 6, paragraph 22 * * page 6 - page 7; examples 2, 5-8; table 1 * * page 7; examples 10, 11; table 2 * [I] 4 | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 22, Database accession no. 1977-39114Y, & JPS5250940 A 19770423 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | DE19814605 |