EP2632540 - PACING INTERVAL DETERMINATION FOR VENTRICULAR DYSSYNCHRONY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAJAN, Vinayakrishnan Riddergaard 8 6227 GA Maastricht / NL | 02 /
STEGEMANN, Berthold Brunssumstrasse 21a 52477 Aachen / DE | 03 /
FRENNEAUX, Michael P. Camphill House Lumphanan Banchory Kincardineshire Aberdeenshire AB314RU / GB | [2017/02] |
Former [2013/36] | 01 /
RAJAN, Vinayakrishnan Riddergaard 8 NL-6227 GA Maastricht / NL | ||
02 /
STEGEMANN, Berthold Brunssumstrasse 21a Northrhine Westfalia 52477 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
FRENNEAUX, Michael P. Camphill House Lumphanan Banchory Kincardineshire Aberdeenshire AB314RU / GB | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/36] | Application number, filing date | 11782316.1 | 28.10.2011 | [2017/02] | WO2011US58248 | Priority number, date | US20100916033 | 29.10.2010 Original published format: US 916033 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012058521 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632540 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2632540 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/368 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/36564 (EP,US);
A61N1/3682 (EP,US);
A61N1/36842 (EP,US);
A61N1/36843 (EP,US);
A61N1/3684 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHRITTSTEUERUNGSINTERVALLBESTIMMUNG FÜR VENTRIKULÄRE DYSSYNCHRONIE | [2013/36] | English: | PACING INTERVAL DETERMINATION FOR VENTRICULAR DYSSYNCHRONY | [2013/36] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'INTERVALLES DE STIMULATION POUR LA DYSSYNCHRONIE VENTRICULAIRE | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 26.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2011 | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | IT | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
TR | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.10.2011 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5713930 (VAN DER VEEN JOHANNES S [NL], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]WO0103769 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2010114232 (MIN XIAOYI [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0038] , [0043] , [0046] , [0059] , [0061] , [0067] , [0074] , [0096] , [0097] , [0124]; figures 1-3,6 * [I] 2,4,5,8,9 |