EP2569833 - PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AN ELECTRIC COMPONENT AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motortech GmbH Hogrevestrasse 21-23 29223 Celle / DE | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZE, Claus Fuhrhopsweg 2 a 29303 Bergen / DE | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Hansen, Jochen Hansen und Heeschen Patentanwälte Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 11782371.6 | 06.05.2011 | [2018/26] | WO2011DE75101 | Priority number, date | DE20101016881 | 11.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010016881 | [2013/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022307 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2569833 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2569833 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01T13/05, H01T21/02, B29C45/14 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H01T13/05 (EP,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,US);
H01R24/38 (US);
H01T21/02 (EP,US);
B29C2045/1673 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C45/14639 (EP,US);
B29C45/34 (EP,US);
B29K2081/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR ELEKTRISCHES BAUTEIL SOWIE ELEKTRISCHES BAUTEIL | [2013/12] | English: | PRODUCTION METHOD FOR AN ELECTRIC COMPONENT AND ELECTRIC COMPONENT | [2013/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE ET COMPOSANT ÉLECTRIQUE | [2013/12] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2011 | AL | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | MT | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | RS | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | SM | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.05.2011 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
MT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.05.2011 | |
AL | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
SM | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
RS | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH0346782 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 1,3-5 * abstract *; | [Y]US5476695 (OKADA MIKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 45 - line L * * column 3, line 60 - line L; figure 1 *; | [A]US3914003 (LOY FRITZ) [A] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 10 - line 45; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2399402 (SPENGLER WALTER J) [A] 2 * page 2, line 50 - line L; figure 1 * | Examination | GB2200258 | by applicant | JPH0346782 | US5476695 | DE10356742 |