EP2572245 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navran Advanced Nanoproducts Development International Pvt Ltd 10B Ground Floor Park Centra Sector 30 Opp. 32nd Milestone Haryana Gurgaon 122001 / IN | [2013/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Abhinava 156 Newton Road Great Barr Birmingham West Midlands B43 / GB | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2013/13] | Bevan, Emma, et al Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | Application number, filing date | 11783168.5 | 06.05.2011 | WO2011IN00319 | Priority number, date | IN2010DEL1164 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: IN 1164DE2010 | [2017/16] |
Former [2013/13] | IN2010DEL1164 | 19.05.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011145107 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2572245 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/00, G03G9/08, G03G9/087 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
G03G9/0804 (EP,US);
G03G9/00 (KR);
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/0819 (EP,US);
G03G9/0821 (EP,US);
G03G9/0823 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | G03G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG STRUKTURIERTER TEILCHEN | [2013/13] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING STRUCTURED PARTICLES | [2013/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PARTICULES STRUCTURÉES | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 02.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 04.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2014 | 31.05.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008213683 (OTA MASAYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0014] , [0043] , [0046] , [0047] , [0049] , [0052] , [0060] , [0062] , [0063] , [0069] , [0071] , [0078] , [0096] , [0099] - [0112] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0123] - [0125] , [0128] *; | [X]EP1946187 (FUJIFILM IMAGING COLORANTS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0045] , [0053] , [0054] , [0060] , [0061] , [0066] , [0068] , [0070] - [0077] - [0091] *; | [A]US2009136863 (ASARESE DANIEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0021] , [0022] , [0036] , [0037] , [0041] , [0042] , [0044] , [0045] * * example - *; | [A]US2003073024 (VANBESIEN DARYL [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0041] , [0050] - [0060] - [0078] - [0091] - [0093] , [0094] * * example - * | International search | [X]US2009269690 (MORRIS DANIEL PATRICK [GB], et al); | [Y]US2010052204 (TAKAGI SEIICHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009136863 (ASARESE DANIEL W [US], et al) |