EP2572558 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LIGHTING CONTROL AND MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Industries, Inc. 10000 Alliance Road Cincinnati, OH 45242 / US | [2013/24] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Virticus Corporation 1915 NW Amberglen Parkway, Suite 120 Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBST, Joseph E. 11875 NE Lauren Lane Newberg, Oregon 97132 / US | 02 /
VANWAGONER, Mark 15484 NW Taenler Court Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2013/13] | Representative(s) | Guy, Elizabeth, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2013/13] | Application number, filing date | 11784227.8 | 19.05.2011 | WO2011US37117 | Priority number, date | US201078310910 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: US 78310910 | [2013/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011146695 | Date: | 24.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2572558 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H04L12/24, G05B19/418 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
H05B31/00 (EP,US);
G05B19/418 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H05B47/165 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (US);
Y02B20/40 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR BELEUCHTUNGSSTEUERUNG UND -ÜBERWACHUNG | [2013/13] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LIGHTING CONTROL AND MONITORING | [2013/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LE CONTRÔLE ET LA SURVEILLANCE DE SYSTÈMES D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2013/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/13] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006002110 (DOWLING KEVIN J [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2007057807 (WALTERS JEFF D [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [Y]EP1865756 (NESA AS [DK]) [Y] 8,9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 1, 2, 10 * * page 1, paragraph 18 - page 8, paragraph 84 * * page 9, paragraphs 89-99 * * page 74, paragraphs 160-171 * * page 77, paragraph 177 - page 79, paragraph 201 ** page 87, paragraphs 290-298 *; | [XY]US2009278479 (PLATNER BRIAN P [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]US2010029268 (MYER SETH JAMISON [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * the whole document * [Y] 8,9 | International search | [A]JP2002124392 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2003036983 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]JP2005538506 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONIC N.V.); | [A]JP2009529214 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONIC N.V. ET AL.) |