EP2646264 - VEHICLE TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.05.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
[2013/41] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOGA, Mareile Heidornstrasse 15/17 30171 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
DIENSTHUBER, Franz Oisselerstrasse 12 30559 Hannover / DE | |||
03 /
SENG, Matthias Stephanusstrasse 10 30449 Hannover / DE | |||
[2013/41] | |||
Representative(s) | Preusser, Andrea, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | ||
[2013/41] | |||
Application number, filing date | 11784470.4 | 11.11.2011 | |
[2016/34] | |||
WO2011EP69922 | |||
Priority number, date | DE20101060933 | 01.12.2010 Original published format: DE102010060933 | |
[2013/41] | |||
Filing language | DE | ||
Procedural language | DE | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2012072404 | ||
Date: | 07.06.2012 | ||
Language: | DE | ||
[2012/23] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP2646264 | ||
Date: | 09.10.2013 | ||
Language: | DE | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2013/41] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP2646264 | ||
Date: | 24.08.2016 | ||
Language: | DE | ||
[2016/34] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 |
Classification | IPC: | B60C11/12 | [2013/41] |
CPC: |
B60C11/1263 (EP);
B60C11/1259 (EP);
B60C11/0302 (EP);
B60C2011/1209 (EP);
B60C2011/1268 (EP)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | ||
Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | |
ME | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLUFTREIFEN | [2013/41] |
English: | VEHICLE TIRE | [2016/15] | |
French: | PNEU POUR VEHICULE | [2016/15] | |
Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | |
01.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
01.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 01.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | |
24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
04.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
08.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | ||
08.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
08.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2016 | ||
Opposition(s) | 26.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31] | |
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2011 | |
AL | 24.08.2016 | ||
CY | 24.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2016 | ||
DK | 24.08.2016 | ||
EE | 24.08.2016 | ||
ES | 24.08.2016 | ||
FI | 24.08.2016 | ||
HR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IS | 24.08.2016 | ||
IT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LT | 24.08.2016 | ||
LV | 24.08.2016 | ||
MC | 24.08.2016 | ||
MK | 24.08.2016 | ||
MT | 24.08.2016 | ||
NL | 24.08.2016 | ||
PL | 24.08.2016 | ||
RO | 24.08.2016 | ||
RS | 24.08.2016 | ||
SI | 24.08.2016 | ||
SK | 24.08.2016 | ||
SM | 24.08.2016 | ||
TR | 24.08.2016 | ||
IE | 11.11.2016 | ||
BG | 24.11.2016 | ||
GB | 24.11.2016 | ||
GR | 25.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 26.12.2016 | ||
[2018/46] | |||
Cited in | International search | [XI]JP2001105808 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-7; | |
[XI]JP2001163015 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-4,8-11 * paragraph [0031]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5-7; | |||
[X]EP2138328 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [X] 1-4* paragraph [0024]; figures 1-2; claim 1 * |