EP2645899 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR LACES, SHOELACES, CORDS AND THE LIKE, PARTICULARLY ADAPTED TO CLOSE SHOES, RUCKSACKS, ITEMS OF CLOTHING AND THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geox S.p.A. Via Feltrina Centro, 16 31044 Montebelluna Località Biadene (Treviso) / IT | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLEGATO MORETTI, Mario Via Fantin, 96 31035 Crocetta Del Montello / IT | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/41] | 01 /
POLEGATO MORETTI, Mario Via Fantin 96 I-31035 Crocetta Del Montello / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/41] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11784656.8 | 17.11.2011 | [2017/44] | WO2011EP70316 | Priority number, date | IT2010PD00369 | 03.12.2010 Original published format: IT PD20100369 | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012072421 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2645899 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2645899 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43C7/04, A43C7/08, A44B11/12, F16G11/10 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
A43C7/04 (EP,US);
A43C7/08 (US);
F16G11/101 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3726 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/41] | A43C7/04, A44B11/12, F16G11/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLOCKIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR BÄNDER, SCHNÜRSENKEL, KORDEN UND DERGLEICHEN, INSBESONDERE ZUM SCHLIESSEN VON SCHUHEN, RUCKSÄCKEN, KLEIDUNGSSTÜCKEN UND DERGLEICHEN | [2017/18] | English: | LOCKING DEVICE FOR LACES, SHOELACES, CORDS AND THE LIKE, PARTICULARLY ADAPTED TO CLOSE SHOES, RUCKSACKS, ITEMS OF CLOTHING AND THE LIKE | [2013/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BLOCAGE POUR CORDONS, LACETS, CORDES ET SIMILAIRES, PARTICULIÈREMENT ADAPTÉ POUR LA FERMETURE DE CHAUSSURES, SACS À DOS, VÊTEMENTS ET SIMILAIRES | [2017/18] |
Former [2013/41] | VERSCHLUSSVORRICHTUNG FÜR RIEMENR, SCHNÜRSENKEL, SCHNÜRE UND DERGLEICHEN, INSBESONDERE ZUM SCHLIESSEN VON SCHUHEN, RUCKSÄCKEN, BEKLEIDUNGSARTIKELN UND DERGLEICHEN | ||
Former [2013/41] | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR CORDONS, LACETS, CORDES ET ANALOGUES, EN PARTICULIER ADAPTÉS À FERMER DES CHAUSSURES, DES SACS À DOS, DES ARTICLES VESTIMENTAIRES ET ANALOGUES | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 17.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2011 | AL | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | IE | 17.11.2017 | LU | 17.11.2017 | MT | 17.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.11.2011 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
IE | 17.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
MT | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
LU | 17.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 01.11.2017 | |
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US819884 (HIGGINS THOMAS [US]) [X] 1-5,10 * the whole document * [A] 6-9,11; | [XA]US2547370 (BOYER CHARLES A) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,11 * the whole document *[A] 4,6,9,10; | [XA]JPH0534905U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-6,11 * the whole document * [A] 7-10; | [XA]WO2006138170 (K 2 CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * page 5 - page 8; figure - * [A] 7-10 | by applicant | US3564670 | US6473999 | US2006000116 |