EP2643368 - COPOLYMERS CONTAINING CARBONIC ACID GROUPS, SULFONIC ACID GROUPS AND POLYALKYLENEOXIDE GROUPS AS ADDITIVE FOR INHIBITING PLAQUE FORMATION IN DETERGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/40] | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING CARBOXYLIC ACID GROUPS, SULPHO GROUPS AND POLYALKYLENE OXIDE GROUPS AS A SCALE-INHIBITING ADDITIVE TO WASHING AND CLEANING PRODUCTS | ||
[2015/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETERING, Jürgen Robert-Koch-Weg 5 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
URTEL, Bolette Niebelungenstrasse 2 67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 03 /
WEBER, Heike Dünenweg 3 68239 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
ETTL, Roland Hans-Thoma-Weg 12a 68804 Altlussheim / DE | 05 /
GÄDT, Torben Traunerstr. 23a 83278 Traunstein / DE | 06 /
HEINTZ, Ewald Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 2 76889 Schweigen-Rechtenbach / DE | 07 /
BASTIGKEIT, Thorsten Gennebrecker Str. 248 42279 Wuppertal / DE | 08 /
EITING, Thomas Am Langen Weiher 37 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 09 /
SENDOR-MÜLLER, Dorota Weidenpark 4 4313 Möhlin / CH | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2013/40] | Schuck, Alexander, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11784708.7 | 22.11.2011 | [2015/39] | WO2011EP70616 | Priority number, date | EP20100192171 | 23.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10192171 | [2013/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069440 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643368 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2643368 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F216/14, C08F220/04, C08F228/02, C11D3/37 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C11D3/378 (EP);
C08F220/04 (KR);
C08F216/14 (KR);
C08F220/06 (EP);
C08F228/02 (KR);
C11D3/37 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08F220/06, C08F220/585, C08F220/286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | COPOLYMERE, DIE CARBONSÄUREGRUPPEN, SULFONSÄUREGRUPPEN UND POLYALKYLENOXIDGRUPPEN ENTHALTEN, ALS BELAGSINHIBIERENDER ZUSATZ ZU WASCH- UND REINIGUNGSMITTELN | [2013/40] | English: | COPOLYMERS CONTAINING CARBONIC ACID GROUPS, SULFONIC ACID GROUPS AND POLYALKYLENEOXIDE GROUPS AS ADDITIVE FOR INHIBITING PLAQUE FORMATION IN DETERGENTS | [2015/23] | French: | COPOLYMÈRES CONTENANT DES GROUPES ACID CARBONIQUE, DES GROUPES ACID SULFONIQUE ET DES GROUPES POLYALKYLÈNEOXYDE EN TANT QU'ADDITIVE POUR EMPECHER LA FORMATION DE LA PLAQUE DANS DETERGANTS | [2015/23] |
Former [2013/40] | COPOLYMERS COMPRISING CARBOXYLIC ACID GROUPS, SULPHO GROUPS AND POLYALKYLENE OXIDE GROUPS AS A SCALE-INHIBITING ADDITIVE TO WASHING AND CLEANING PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2013/40] | COPOLYMÈRES, QUI CONTIENNENT DES GROUPES ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE, DES GROUPES ACIDE SULFONIQUE ET DES GROUPES POLY(OXYDE D'ALKYLÈNE), EN TANT QU'ADDITIF ANTI-DÉPÔT À DES AGENTS DE LAVAGE ET DE RINÇAGE | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2011 | AL | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | MT | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | IE | 22.11.2015 | LU | 22.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.11.2011 | |
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.11.2011 | |
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE102007019458 (BASF SE [DE]) [I] 1-13* the whole document * | by applicant | US5039447 | US5292447 | US5294362 | US5422028 | EP0778340 | EP0851023 | DE19819187 | WO0208527 | DE10225794 | WO2005042684 | WO2008132131 | WO2010024468 | - H. FIKENTSCHER, CELLULOSE-CHEMIE, (1932), vol. 13, pages 58 - 64,71-74 | - M.J.R. CANTOW, J.POLYM.SCI. ,A, (1967), vol. 1, no. 5, pages 1391 - 1394 |