EP2633523 - DECOMPOSITION OF AUDIO SIGNALS USING BASIS FUNCTIONS WITH TIME-EVOLUTION INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/36] | DECOMPOSITION OF MUSIC SIGNALS USING BASIS FUNCTIONS WITH TIME-EVOLUTION INFORMATION | ||
[2013/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VISSER, Erik c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
GUO, Yinyi c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
ZHU, Mofei c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
RYU, Sang-Uk c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 05 /
KIM, Lae-Hoon c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 06 /
SHIN, Jongwon c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Loveless, Ian Mark, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11784836.6 | 25.10.2011 | WO2011US57712 | Priority number, date | US201113280295 | 24.10.2011 Original published format: US201113280295 | US201061406376P | 25.10.2010 Original published format: US 201061406376 P | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012058225 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2633523 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2633523 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G10L25/48, G10L21/0272, // G10L19/008 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G10L21/0272 (EP,US);
G10L19/00 (KR);
G10L25/48 (EP,US);
G10L19/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | G10L21/02, G10L11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DEKOMPOSITION VON AUDIOSIGNALEN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON BASISFUNKTIONEN MIT INFORMATIONEN ZUR ZEITLICHEN ENTWICKLUNG | [2013/45] | English: | DECOMPOSITION OF AUDIO SIGNALS USING BASIS FUNCTIONS WITH TIME-EVOLUTION INFORMATION | [2013/45] | French: | DÉCOMPOSITION DES SIGNAUX AUDIO UTILISANT DES FONCTIONS DE BASE AVEC DE L'INFORMATION SUR L'ÉVOLUTION TEMPORELLE | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/36] | ZERLEGUNG VON MUSIKSIGNALEN MIT BASISFUNKTIONEN MIT ZEITVERLAUFSINFORMATIONEN | ||
Former [2013/36] | DECOMPOSITION OF MUSIC SIGNALS USING BASIS FUNCTIONS WITH TIME-EVOLUTION INFORMATION | ||
Former [2013/36] | DÉCOMPOSITION DE SIGNAUX DE MUSIQUE EN UTILISANT DES FONCTIONS DE BASE AVEC DES INFORMATIONS D'ÉVOLUTION TEMPORELLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2011 | AL | 09.04.2014 | AT | 09.04.2014 | BE | 09.04.2014 | CY | 09.04.2014 | CZ | 09.04.2014 | DK | 09.04.2014 | EE | 09.04.2014 | ES | 09.04.2014 | FI | 09.04.2014 | HR | 09.04.2014 | IT | 09.04.2014 | LT | 09.04.2014 | LV | 09.04.2014 | MC | 09.04.2014 | MK | 09.04.2014 | MT | 09.04.2014 | NL | 09.04.2014 | PL | 09.04.2014 | RO | 09.04.2014 | RS | 09.04.2014 | SE | 09.04.2014 | SI | 09.04.2014 | SK | 09.04.2014 | SM | 09.04.2014 | TR | 09.04.2014 | BG | 09.07.2014 | NO | 09.07.2014 | GR | 10.07.2014 | IS | 09.08.2014 | PT | 11.08.2014 | IE | 25.10.2014 | LU | 25.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | FR | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MK | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
MT | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
TR | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 25.10.2011 | |
AT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CY | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
SM | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
IE | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SI | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
MC | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
LU | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RO | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
EE | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
SK | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
BE | 09.04.2014 | ||
DK | 09.04.2014 | ||
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
PT | 11.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
RS | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.04.2014 | |
ES | 09.04.2014 | ||
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | ES | 09.04.2014 | |
FI | 09.04.2014 | ||
HR | 09.04.2014 | ||
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
LV | 09.04.2014 | ||
NL | 09.04.2014 | ||
PL | 09.04.2014 | ||
SE | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
GR | 10.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 09.04.2014 | |
LT | 09.04.2014 | ||
BG | 09.07.2014 | ||
NO | 09.07.2014 | ||
IS | 09.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 09.04.2014 | |
BG | 09.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A] - S.A. ABDALLAH ET AL, "Unsupervised Analysis of Polyphonic Music by Sparse Coding", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, (20060101), vol. 17, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TNN.2005.861031, ISSN 1045-9227, pages 179 - 196, XP055015161 [A] 1-43 * abstract * * figures 5,6,8,10,11 * * page 180, left-hand column, lines 3-15 * * page 180, section II.A, lines 3-13 * * page 182, section III, lines 2-4 and 48-50 * * page 185, left-hand column, lines 9-27 * * section IV.C * * page 190, left-hand column, lines 7-23 * * section V.D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNN.2005.861031 | [A] - Michael Syskind Pedersen ET AL, "A Survey of Convolutive Blind Source Separation Methods", Springer Handbook on Speech Processing and Speech Communication, Springer, (20070101), pages 1 - 34, ISBN 978-3-54-049125-5, XP055015264 [A] 1-43 * sections 5.2.2, 5.3 * | by applicant | - VINCENT ET AL., "Performance Measurement in Blind Audio Source Separation", IEEE TRANS. ASSP, (200607), vol. 14, no. 4, pages 1462 - 1469 |