EP2630068 - CUTTING DEVICE OF A TEXTILE YARN DURING ITS FEEDING TO AN OPERATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTSR International S.p.A. Via Santa Rita, SNC 21057 Olgiate Olona (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states BTSR International S.P.A. Via Santa Rita, SNC 21057 Olgiate Olona (VA) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAREA, Tiziano Via Valle Olona 17 I-21052 Busto Arsizio (Varese) / IT | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 11785082.6 | 11.10.2011 | WO2011IB02477 | Priority number, date | IT2010MI01905 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: IT MI20101905 | [2013/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052819 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630068 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2630068 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/71 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B65H54/71 (EP,US);
B65H35/06 (US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2022 (EP,US);
Y10T83/739 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDVORRICHTUNG FÜR TEXTILGARN WÄHREND SEINER ZUFÜHRUNG ZU EINER BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/35] | English: | CUTTING DEVICE OF A TEXTILE YARN DURING ITS FEEDING TO AN OPERATING DEVICE | [2013/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPE D'UN FIL TEXTILE PENDANT L'ALIMENTATION D'UN DISPOSITIF FONCTIONNEL EN CE FIL TEXTILE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 28.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.10.2011 | AL | 26.11.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | RS | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 11.10.2011 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 11.10.2011 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 26.11.2014 | |
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB831997 (BARLOW & COMPANY NOTTM LTD J) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3023656 (HENDRIK GLASTRA) [A] 1 * column 5, lines 3-46; figure - *; | [AD]US3132407 (HENDRIK GLASTRA) [AD] 1-6 * column 1, lines 10-12,33-55 * * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, lines 23-30; figure - *; | [A]US3322013 (ERNST FELIX) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US3570353 (HESS KURT) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [XAI]US3854356 (OKREGLAK R) [X] 1,6 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5 [I] 3,4,7,8; | [A]US2002149456 (KRIMMER ERWIN [DE], et al) [A] 1* figure -; claim 1 *; | [AD]CH699425 (USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG [CH]) [AD] 1-6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 10-16 * | by applicant | US3132407 | CH699425 |