EP2638582 - HIGH CAPACITY ALLOY ANODES AND LITHIUM-ION ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OBROVAC, Mark, N. 1459 Oxford Street P.O. Box 15000 Halifax Nova Scotia B3H 4R2 / CA | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11785201.2 | 31.10.2011 | WO2011US58504 | Priority number, date | US20100411653P | 09.11.2010 Original published format: US 411653 P | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012064531 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638582 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/1395, H01M4/1391, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, H01M4/525, H01M4/587, H01M4/62, H01M4/66, H01M10/0525, H01M4/02 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/058 (KR);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (US);
H01M4/1395 (US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/587 (KR);
H01M4/621 (EP,US);
H01M4/622 (US);
H01M4/661 (EP,US);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/387 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP);
Y10T29/49115 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | ANODEN AUS EINER HOCHLEISTUNGSLEGIERUNG UND LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIEZELLEN DAMIT | [2013/38] | English: | HIGH CAPACITY ALLOY ANODES AND LITHIUM-ION ELECTROCHEMICAL CELLS CONTAINING SAME | [2013/38] | French: | ANODES EN ALLIAGE À HAUTE CAPACITÉ ET PILES ÉLECTROCHIMIQUES AU LITHIUM-ION LES CONTENANT | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 01.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008248386 (OBROVAC MARK N [US], et al) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0069] * * claims 2,4,5,6,7,8,9,16,17,22,24 *; | [Y]US2007148544 (LE DINH BA [US]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * table 1A * * claims 1,13,14,25,27 *; | [XP]US2010330428 (DAHN JEFFREY R [CA], et al) [XP] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0011] , [0022] , [0023] , [0042] - [0050] - [0059] - [0061] - [0063] * * table 1 * * claims 1,14,15,18 * | [Y] - HASSOUN ET AL, "An electrochemical investigation of a Sn-Co-C ternary alloy as a negative electrode in Li-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, (20070908), vol. 171, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2007.06.067, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 928 - 931, XP022238107 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2007.06.067 | by applicant | US5858324 | US5900385 | US6143268 | US6680145 | US6964828 | US7211237 | US7556655 | US2004121234 | US2008032185 | US2008280205 | US2009087747 | US2010015516 | WO2009120515 | US7368071 | US7498100 | US7767349 | US2007020521 | US2007020522 | US2006068292 | US2006099506 | US2008187838 | US7026074 | US2007092802 | US7585590 | US7615312 | US7615317 | US7648801 | US7811710 |