EP2656597 - SELF-AWARE PROFILE SWITCHING ON A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Lantian 5817 Chambertin Drive San Jose California 95118 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Schley, Jan Malte Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11785540.3 | 07.11.2011 | WO2011US59579 | Priority number, date | US20100943529 | 10.11.2010 Original published format: US 943529 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012064651 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2656597 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04M1/72451 (GB);
G06F3/04842 (KR,US);
H04M1/72454 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04M19/04 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W4/185 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/21 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Title | German: | ICH-BEWUSSTE PROFILUMSCHALTUNG BEI EINER MOBILE DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/44] | English: | SELF-AWARE PROFILE SWITCHING ON A MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE | [2013/44] | French: | COMMUTATION AUTONOME DE PROFIL SUR UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE MOBILE | [2013/44] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/44] | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2013/44] | 26.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/49] | 23.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2016 | 04.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees SE, HU, TR, SM, SK, SI, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | 26.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005215243 (BLACK KENNETH R [US], et al); | [A]WO2009077848 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [XI]US2009170532 (LEE MICHAEL M [US], et al) |