12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
11.09.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
17.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
10.10.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.11.2014 [2014/45] |
27.09.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.09.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.05.2014 |
Change - inventor |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
19.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
03.01.2014 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] |
06.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.07.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
19.07.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
27.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|