EP2577199 - SOLAR-POWERED DRYING, HEATING AND AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solarkilns Holdings Pty Ltd Suite 11, Level 1 50 New Street Ringwood, VIC 3134 / AU | [2017/15] |
Former [2015/19] | For all designated states Solarkilns Pty Ltd Suite 11, Level 1 50 New Street Ringwood VIC 3134 / AU | ||
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Solarkilns Holdings Pty Ltd 158-160 Yarra Street Level 1 Warrandyte, Victoria 3113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIR, Gregory PO Box 332 Boronia Victoria 3155 / AU | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Miller, James Lionel Woolverton, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11785920.7 | 25.05.2011 | [2017/17] | WO2011AU00635 | Priority number, date | AU20100902290 | 25.05.2010 Original published format: AU 2010902290 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011146993 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577199 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577199 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F26B3/28, F26B21/02, F26B21/12, F26B25/14, // F24J2/42 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
F26B3/286 (EP,US);
F26B3/283 (US);
F26B21/02 (EP,US);
F26B21/028 (US);
F26B21/12 (EP,US);
F26B25/14 (EP,US);
F24S90/00 (EP,US);
F26B2200/18 (EP,US);
F26B2210/16 (EP,US);
Y02B40/18 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | F26B3/28, B27K5/00, F24J2/42, F26B21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOLARGESTEUERTES TROCKNUNGS-, HEIZUNGS- UND KLIMAANLAGEN-SYSTEM | [2013/15] | English: | SOLAR-POWERED DRYING, HEATING AND AIR-CONDITIONING SYSTEM | [2013/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉCHAGE, DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE CLIMATISATION ALIMENTÉ PAR L'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 18.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2011 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | IE | 25.05.2017 | LU | 25.05.2017 | MT | 25.05.2017 | BE | 31.05.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
MT | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
BE | 31.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 25.05.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.05.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4291833 (FRANCHINA ANTHONINO A) [I] 6,8 * figure 1 ** column 4, line 38 - line 47 *; | [A]FR2499831 (MULLER JEAN MARC [FR]) [A] 1-3,9,10 * figures 7, 8 * * page 4, line 3 - line 16 *; | [X]US2002117166 (OKUMURA AKIO [JP]) [X] 6,8 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0100] *; | [A]US2005246919 (DELONS LUC [FR]) [A] 1,9 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * | International search | [A]US4069593 (HUANG BARNEY K); | [X]US4432147 (CHEN PETER Y S [US], et al); | [Y]US5325604 (LITTLE ROBERT L [US]); | [X]JP2003245906 (MARUSHOU GIKEN KK); | [A]WO2006053392 (AUSTRALIAN CHOICE TIMBER SUPPL [AU], et al); | [A]US2007256318 (SUGAWARA TOMOYOSHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003245906 |