EP2698927 - METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING CROSS-TALK IN DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE SERVICE TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/23] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Lang c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TU, Jianping c/o Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2017/23] |
Former [2014/08] | 01 /
ZHOU, Lang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
TU, Jianping Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2014/08] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11786144.3 | 07.06.2011 | [2017/23] | WO2011CN75362 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011147372 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2698927 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2698927 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/32, H04M11/06, H04M3/30 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H04B3/32 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04M3/304 (EP,US);
H04M3/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/08] | H04B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON ÜBERSPRECHEN BEI EINER DSL-DIENSTÜBERTRAGUNG | [2014/08] | English: | METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR REDUCING CROSS-TALK IN DIGITAL SUBSCRIBER LINE SERVICE TRANSMISSION | [2014/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE RÉDUIRE LA DIAPHONIE LORS DE LA TRANSMISSION D'UN SERVICE DE LIGNE D'ABONNÉ NUMÉRIQUE | [2014/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2013 | Translation filed | 11.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 29.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2011 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IE | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LU | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | MT | 07.06.2017 | NL | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | FR | 07.08.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.06.2011 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 07.08.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LU | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
NL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006129140 (ADAPTIVE SPECTRUM & SIGNAL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 24 * * page 19, line 6 - page 20, line 4 ** page 25, line 10 - page 26, line 1 * | International search | [A]KR20050073850 (KT CORP [KR]); | [A]CN1863078 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1866938 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101399575 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN101505177 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]US2010246606 (CENDRILLON RAPHAEL JEAN [CN], et al) |