Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20130113346 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10164239 | 28.05.2010 | WO2011IB52353 | 30.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013533904 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10164239 | 28.05.2010 | WO2011IB52353 | 30.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102906177B | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B | CN102906177 | 30.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | EP10164239 | 28.05.2010 | WO2011IB52353 | 30.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2576682 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | A4 | EP2576682 | 10.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10164239 | 28.05.2010 | EP11786222 | 30.05.2011 | WO2011IB52353 | 30.05.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011148357 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10164239 | 28.05.2010 |