EP2576682 - COMPOSITE MATERIALS, PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF IN ELECTRICAL CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JANSSEN, Nicole Am Hildegardisberg 5a 55234 Bermersheim / DE | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11786222.7 | 30.05.2011 | WO2011IB52353 | Priority number, date | EP20100164239 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: EP 10164239 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011148357 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2576682 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08K11/00, H01M4/136, H01M4/36, H01M4/58, H01M4/60, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, C08K3/04, C08K3/06, C08K9/02 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP,KR);
C08K3/06 (EP,KR);
C08K9/02 (EP,KR);
C08L33/20 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (KR);
H01M4/136 (EP);
H01M4/362 (EP);
H01M4/5815 (EP);
H01M4/604 (EP);
H01M4/608 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | C08K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | VERBUNDMATERIALIEN, IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN STROMZELLEN | [2013/15] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIALS, PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF IN ELECTRICAL CELLS | [2013/15] | French: | MATÉRIAUX COMPOSITES, LEUR FABRICATION ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PILES VOLTAÏQUES | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 27.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2010044437 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract *; | [E]EP2337126 (NAT INST OF ADVANCED IND SCIEN [JP], et al) [E] 1-16 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0062] * * figure 5 * * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0102] *; | [X]CN101577323 (UNIV SHANGHAI JIAOTONG [CN]) [X] 1-16 * pages 6,7 * * claims 1,5,7 *; | [X]US2004009399 (KIM SEOK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9-11,16 * examples 1,2 * | International search | [A]WO2009143405 (UNIV NORTH CAROLINA [US], et al); | [A]CN101558455 (UNIV PRINCETON [US]) |