EP2578728 - SURFACE TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI Daishi c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
KATO Masaki c/o c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
TATSUMOTO Kazuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Department AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/15] | Application number, filing date | 11786385.2 | 03.03.2011 | WO2011JP54920 | Priority number, date | JP20100121414 | 27.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010121414 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011148685 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578728 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/00, C25D5/02, C25D11/00 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C25D5/02 (EP,US);
C25D11/005 (EP,US);
C25D17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSGERÄT | [2013/15] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2013/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2012 | Translation filed | 12.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 01.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008291302 (AISIN SEIKI); | [A]JP2003147587 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD); | [A]JP2003119593 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD) | by applicant | JP2003119593 |