EP2579261 - WORKING DEVICE FOR USE IN WATER CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOE, Fumihiro c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8215 / JP | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11786430.6 | 14.04.2011 | WO2011JP59275 | Priority number, date | JP20100123541 | 28.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010123541 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011148730 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2579261 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21C17/003, F22B37/02, G21C19/02 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G21C17/003 (EP,US);
F22B37/003 (EP,US);
F22B37/005 (EP,US);
G21C17/013 (EP,US);
G21D1/006 (EP,US);
Y02E30/00 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ARBEIT IN EINER WASSERKAMMER | [2013/15] | English: | WORKING DEVICE FOR USE IN WATER CHAMBER | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAVAIL DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UNE CHAMBRE D'EAU | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | Translation filed | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 24.10.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS57124297 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [A]JPS54127058 (BABCOCK & WILCOX CO); | [A]JPS59126242 (BBC REAKTOR GMBH); | [A]JPH06148378 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al); | [A]JPH05256985 (B & W NUCLEAR SERVICE CO.); | [A]JPH0395494 (FRAGEMA FRAMATOME & COGEMA) | by applicant | JPH10227765 |