EP2577650 - STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DRIVING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ho-Seop 203-1302 Hyojachon Donga Apt. Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-763 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Dae-Sik 641-602 Naru Maeul World Meridian Apt. Bansong-dong Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 445-754 / KR | 03 /
CHA, Kyung-Hoon 102-304 Sinil Apt. Yeongdeo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-741 / KR | 04 /
JUNG, Jong-Hoon 301-1803 Jugong Greenville Apt. Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-794 / KR | 05 /
KO, Young-Ji 105-803 Taeyoung Apt. Daeheung-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-764 / KR | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11786898.4 | 25.05.2011 | WO2011KR03829 | Priority number, date | US20100347969P | 25.05.2010 Original published format: US 347969 P | US20100362371P | 08.07.2010 Original published format: US 362371 P | KR20100120610 | 30.11.2010 Original published format: KR 20100120610 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011149266 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2577650 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.05.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, H04N13/00, G02B27/22, G09G3/34 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
G02B30/24 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/003 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/20 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/342 (EP,US);
H04N13/341 (EP,KR,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0221 (EP,US);
G09G2310/024 (EP,US);
G09G2310/062 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | G09G3/36, H04N13/00, G02B27/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | STEREOSKOPISCHE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER ANSTEUERUNG | [2013/15] | English: | STEREOSCOPIC DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF DRIVING THE SAME | [2013/15] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE STÉRÉOSCOPIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CELUI-CI | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 15.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 17.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/24] | 27.01.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2009237495 (KAWAHARA KUNIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 9,13-15; | [XY]US2008284801 (BRIGHAM SCOTT E [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,11,12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 4,9,13-15; | [Y]US2003179221 (NITTA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0129]; figures 10,11 *; | [Y]US6448952 (TOYODA AKITO [JP], et al) [Y] 9,13-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0105]; figures 1-29 * | International search | [X]US2009237495 (KAWAHARA KUNIHIKO [JP]); | [X]US2010066820 (PARK SANG-MOO [KR], et al); | [A]US2007229487 (SLAVENBURG GERRIT A [US], et al); | [A]JP2009031524 (SONY CORP) |