EP2577680 - LIQUID FUEL NUCLEAR FISSION REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TerraPower LLC 15800 Northup Way Bellevue Washington 98008 / US | [2018/48] |
Former [2014/29] | For all designated states TerraPower LLC 330 120th Avenue NE, Suite 100 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | ||
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Searete LLC 11235 SE 6th Street Suite 200 Bellevue, WA 98004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYDE, Roderick, A. c/o TerraPower, LLC 330 120th Avenue NE, Suite 100 Bellevue Washington 98005 / US | 02 /
MCWHIRTER, Jon, David c/o TerraPower, LLC 330 120th Avenue NE, Suite 100 Bellevue Washington 98005 / US | [2015/45] |
Former [2013/15] | 01 /
HYDE, Roderick, A. 9915 - 161st Avenue N.E. Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | ||
02 /
MCWHIRTER, Jon, David 11211 N.E. 128th St. K201 Kirkland, Washington 98034 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/15] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11787029.5 | 25.05.2011 | [2019/09] | WO2011US00943 | Priority number, date | US20100804091 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: US 804091 | US20100804087 | 12.07.2010 Original published format: US 804087 | US20100800400 | 25.05.2010 Original published format: US 800400 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011149538 | Date: | 01.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2577680 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2577680 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G21C23/00, G21C1/22, G21C1/32, G21C3/24, G21C5/02, G21G1/08 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G21G1/08 (EP,KR);
G21C1/22 (EP);
G21C1/326 (EP);
G21C3/24 (EP);
G21C5/02 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | G21G1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGBRENNSTOFF-KERNSPALTUNGSREAKTOR | [2018/41] | English: | LIQUID FUEL NUCLEAR FISSION REACTOR | [2013/15] | French: | RÉACTEUR DE FISSION NUCLÉAIRE À COMBUSTIBLE LIQUIDE | [2013/15] |
Former [2013/15] | FLÜSSIGKRAFTSTOFF-KERNSPALTUNGSREAKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 19.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 12.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.05.2011 | AL | 27.02.2019 | AT | 27.02.2019 | CY | 27.02.2019 | CZ | 27.02.2019 | DK | 27.02.2019 | EE | 27.02.2019 | ES | 27.02.2019 | FI | 27.02.2019 | HR | 27.02.2019 | IT | 27.02.2019 | LT | 27.02.2019 | LV | 27.02.2019 | MC | 27.02.2019 | MK | 27.02.2019 | MT | 27.02.2019 | NL | 27.02.2019 | PL | 27.02.2019 | RO | 27.02.2019 | RS | 27.02.2019 | SE | 27.02.2019 | SI | 27.02.2019 | SK | 27.02.2019 | SM | 27.02.2019 | TR | 27.02.2019 | IE | 25.05.2019 | LU | 25.05.2019 | BG | 27.05.2019 | NO | 27.05.2019 | GR | 28.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | IS | 27.06.2019 | PT | 27.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
MT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.05.2011 | |
AL | 27.02.2019 | ||
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CY | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
TR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SI | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.05.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
MC | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
AT | 27.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
PL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
SM | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.02.2019 | |
CZ | 27.02.2019 | ||
DK | 27.02.2019 | ||
EE | 27.02.2019 | ||
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RO | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
SK | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 27.02.2019 | |
ES | 27.02.2019 | ||
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.02.2019 | |
FI | 27.02.2019 | ||
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
IT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
HR | 27.02.2019 | ||
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
LV | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
RS | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
IS | 27.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
BG | 27.05.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
GR | 28.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NL | 27.02.2019 | ||
SE | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.02.2019 | |
LT | 27.02.2019 | ||
NO | 27.05.2019 | ||
PT | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2853446 (ABBOTT WILLIAM E, et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-13,15 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 33; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,4,6,14; | [A]DE1172781 (HARRY N SCHLUDI DR) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 4 - column 4, line 2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]US3280011 (O'CONNOR THOMAS L, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 15 - column 6, line 58 *; | [XA]DE2832552 (BECH ULRICH DIPL ING) [X] 1,3-13,15 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 29; figure 1; claims 1-4 *[A] 2,14; | [A]US4257847 (GIBBY RONALD L, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 11 - column 3, line 15; figures 1-4 *; | [A]USH689H (CHRISTIANSEN ET AL.) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 11 - column 5, line 61; figures 1-8 * | International search | [Y]US3280011 (O'CONNOR THOMAS L, et al); | [A]US3293135 (SEYMOUR JAYE, et al); | [Y]US4257847 (GIBBY RONALD L, et al); | [A]US5774514 (RUBBIA CARLO [CH]); | [A]US2005082469 (CARLO RUBBIA [CH]) | by applicant | US2853446 | DE2832552 |