|
08.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.07.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
217 |
|
20.03.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
217 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
211 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Description |
Search / examination |
211 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
16.08.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.11.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
15.02.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
02.06.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
30.05.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2013 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2013 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2013 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.12.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.10.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.04.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2012 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
83 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
166 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
233 |