Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012075437 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2013 | A8 | WO2012075437 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012009470 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2012 | A8 | WO2012009470 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9494341 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2015073594 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015007870 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US201414496497 | 25.09.2014 | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9506783 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2016 | B2 | US2013238271 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US201313868036 | 22.04.2013 | US201113310520 | 02.12.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8442790 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2013 | B2 | US2012123720 | 17.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US201113310520 | 02.12.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012012101 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8881720 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2014 | B2 | US2011240007 | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10520223 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2019 | B2 | US2017067668 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US201615356433 | 18.11.2016 | US201313868036 | 22.04.2013 | US201113310520 | 02.12.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6232032B | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | B2 | JP2016053471 | 14.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5846213B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B2 | JP2013544346 | 12.12.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5995845B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2016 | B2 | JP2013535641 | 12.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5854337B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | JP2013533450 | 22.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2646759 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2018 | B1 | EP2646759 | 25.02.2015 | A4 | EP2646759 | 09.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2593726 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2017 | A4 | EP2593726 | 22.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103328907B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B | CN103328907 | 25.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103119380B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2015 | B | CN103119380 | 22.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103097829B | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | B | CN103097829 | 08.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015200879B | Global Dossier | 17.11.2016 | B2 | AU2015200879 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2015200879 | 20.02.2015 | AU2011258022 | 27.05.2011 | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011336375B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2017 | B2 | AU2011336375 | 13.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011279154B | Global Dossier | 18.06.2015 | B2 | AU2011279154 | 24.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011258022B | Global Dossier | 27.11.2014 | B2 | AU2011258022 | 13.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2577183 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2577183 | 03.05.2017 | A4 | EP2577183 | 10.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012029715 | 07.03.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013000735 | 24.05.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112013013406 | 06.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2800095 | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2804887 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2819243 | 07.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2012003332 | 08.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2013000147 | 08.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2013001581 | 27.12.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113063144 | 02.12.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX343473 | 07.11.2016 | B | MX2012013755 | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US38412 | 27.05.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX336475 | 20.01.2016 | B | MX2013000499 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | WO2011US43905 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2013006243 | 01.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113118274 | 27.05.2011 | US201113182297 | 13.07.2011 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 | WO2011US63144 | 02.12.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011150373 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34969710 | 28.05.2010 | US36472910 | 15.07.2010 | US41968510 | 03.12.2010 |