Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9943949 | Global Dossier | 17.04.2018 | B2 | US2013156496 | 20.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011DE75199 | 23.08.2011 | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017201741B | Global Dossier | 17.01.2019 | B2 | AU2017201741 | 30.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011DE75199 | 23.08.2011 | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | AU2017201741 | 14.03.2017 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | AU2011304834 | 23.08.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011304834 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011DE75199 | 23.08.2011 | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2608935 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2018 | B1 | EP2608935 | 03.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011DE75199 | 23.08.2011 | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010035221 | 18.04.2013 | B4 | DE102010035221 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010035222 | 18.04.2013 | B4 | DE102010035222 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2668876T | 22.05.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2011DE75199 | 23.08.2011 | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012037935 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010035221 | 24.08.2010 | DE102010035222 | 24.08.2010 |