EP2643047 - MEDICAL PROBE AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING A MEDICAL PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Bakken Research Center B.V. Endepolsdomein 5 6229 GW Maastricht / NL | [2015/40] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Meditronic Bakken Research Center B.V. Endepolsdomein 5 6229 GW Maastricht / NL | ||
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Sapiens Steering Brain Stimulation B.V. High Tech Campus 41 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARDOEL, Michel Gerardus Dorenbos 10 NL-5731 EA Mierlo / NL | 02 /
DECRÉ, Michel Marcel Jose Hoogstraat 343 NL-5654 NC Eindhoven / NL | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/09] | Prinz & Partner Patentanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/40] | Rupprecht, Kay, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47-50 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11787910.6 | 25.11.2011 | WO2011EP71068 | Priority number, date | EP20100192512 | 25.11.2010 Original published format: EP 10192512 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012069649 | Date: | 31.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2643047 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
A61N1/0534 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/086 (EP,KR,US);
A61N1/3605 (KR);
A61N1/36128 (KR);
Y10T29/302 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE SONDE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINER MEDIZINISCHEN SONDE | [2013/40] | English: | MEDICAL PROBE AND A METHOD OF PROVIDING A MEDICAL PROBE | [2013/40] | French: | SONDE MÉDICALE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UNE SONDE MÉDICALE | [2013/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 11.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/10] | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US2006200218 (WAHLSTRAND CARL D [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13,14 * paragraphs [0054] , [0070]; figures 2,6,10,31-36 * * paragraphs [0051] , [0079] , [0080] * * paragraphs [0069] , [0077] , [0080]; figures 30,39 * [A] 5,11 [Y] 7,12,15; | [Y]US6374143 (BERRANG PETER G [CA], et al) [Y] 7,15 * column 15, line 42 *; | [Y]WO2005039696 (UNIV MICHIGAN [US], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0045] *; | [A]US2007132109 (JACOBSEN STEPHEN C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2010055453 | by applicant | CN101708353 | US2007123765 |