EP2621906 - DIAZARIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING MENTAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/32] | DIAZARIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING METAL DISORDERS | ||
[2016/14] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmdiscovery LLP 23-24 Great James Street Suite 2 London WC1N 3ES / GB | For all designated states Shevtsov, Alexander Vladimirovich 22 Apt., 22 Novaya str. Serpuhov Moscow Region 142203 / RU | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEVTSOV, Alexander, Vladimirovich 22 Apt., 22 Novaya str. Serpuhov Moscow Region 142203 / RU | 02 /
PETUKHOVA, Vera, Yur'evna 10 Apt. 57-1 Beskudnikovsky blv. Moscow 127486 / RU | 03 /
NOVAKOVSKIY, Vladimir, Vladimirovich 136 Apt., 7 Asafieva str. bld. 1 St.Petersburg 194356 / RU | 04 /
MAKHOVA, Nina, Nikolayevna 188 Apt. 5 Bataisky proezd Moscow 109651 / RU | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Gilholm, Stephen Philip IPheions Intellectual Property Buzzard Office The Hawk Creative Business Park Easingwold, York YO61 3FE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip IPheions Intellectual Property Buzzard Office The Hawk Creative Business Park Easingwold York YO61 3FE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11788228.2 | 29.09.2011 | WO2011IB54304 | Priority number, date | US20100387844P | 29.09.2010 Original published format: US 387844 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042502 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621906 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D229/02, A61K31/336, A61P25/24 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
C07D229/02 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | DIAZARIDINDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON METALLKRANKHEITEN | [2013/32] | English: | DIAZARIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING MENTAL DISORDERS | [2016/14] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE DIAZARIDINE UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES TROUBLES MENTAUX | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/32] | DIAZARIDINE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING METAL DISORDERS | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 20.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.04.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.04.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2015 | 30.09.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2016 | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - KAMUF M. ET AL., "Stereodynamics of tetramezine", CHIRALITY 2011, (20100915), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 113 - 117, XP009154973 [X] 13 * page 115, results and discussion, first 2 paragraphs * [I] 13-20 | [I] - YU PETUKHOVA V ET AL, "Synthesis and structure of 1-[Ï -(3,3-dialkyldiaziridin-1-yl)alkyl]-3 ,3-dialkyldiaziridines", RUSSIAN CHEMICAL BULLETIN, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20070801), vol. 56, no. 8, ISSN 1573-9171, pages 1550 - 1554, XP019580499 [I] 1,13 * scheme 3, compound 1a * * scheme 4, compounds 1b-e * | [X] - SKRUPSKAYA T V ET AL, "Complexes of Î+-Ï -bis(3,3-dialkyldiaziridin-1-yl)alkanes and their bis(2-arylcarbamoyl) derivatives with cadmium and nickel salts", RUSSIAN CHEMICAL BULLETIN, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS-PLENUM PUBLISHERS, NE, (20080110), vol. 57, no. 1, ISSN 1573-9171, pages 56 - 62, XP019687912 [X] 1 * scheme 1, compounds 1a, 1c and 1b * | [A] - KOSTYANOVSKII, "Synthesis and psychotropic activity of functional substituted diazaridines and bisdiazaridines", KHIMIKO-FARMATSEVTICHESKII ZHURNAL, (1986), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 671 - 674, XP009154974 [A] 1-23 * compounds Va-r * | by applicant | - BLIER P.; WARD M., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (2003), vol. 53, pages 193 - 203 | - STAHL S M., Essential Psychopharmacology, (2008), page 531 | - C. J. PAGET; C. S. DAVIS, J. MED. CHEM., (1964), vol. 7, page 626 | - R. G. KOSTIANOVSKY; G. V. SHUSTOV; 0. G. NABIEV; S. N. DENISENKO; S. A. SUKHANOVA; E. F. LAVRETSKAYA, KHIM-PHARM. J., (1986), vol. 20, page 671 | - Diagnostic and Statistical Manual of Mental Disorders, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION | - KUZNETSOV, V. V.; MAKHOVA, N. N.;; STRELENKO, YU. A., KHMEL'NITSKII, L. I. IZV. ACAD. NAUK, SSSR, SER. KHIM., (1991), page 2861 | - BULL. ACAD. SCI. USSR, DIV. CHEM. SCI., (1991), vol. 40, page 2496 | - KUZNETSOV, V. V.; MAKHOVA, N. N.; KHMEL'NITSKII, L. I., IZV. ACAD. NAUK, SER. KHIM., (1997), page 1410 | - RUSS. CHEM. BULL., (1997), vol. 46, page 1354 | - KUZNETSOV, V. V.; MAKHOVA, N. N.; STRELENKO, YU. A., KHMEL'NITSKII, L. I. IZV. ACAD. NAUK, SSSR, SER. KHIM., (1991), page 2861 | - "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, no. 1, pages 1 - 19 |