EP2638549 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBON PROTECTED SUPERPARAMAGNETIC OR MAGNETIC NANOSPHERES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Studiengesellschaft Kohle mbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Platz 1 45470 Mülheim / DE | For all designated states Dalian University of Technology No.2 Linggong Road Ganjingzi District Dalian Liaoning 116024 / CN | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUETH, Ferdi Bunsenstr. 12 45470 Mülheim / DE | 02 /
FEYEN, Mathias Talstr. 1a D-69493 Hirschberg/bergstrasse / DE | 03 /
LU, An-Hui Wuyi Road Xueqingyuan-40-2-2 Shahekou District Dalian Liaoning 116023 / CN | 04 /
LI, Wen-Cui Wuyi Road Xueqingyuan-40-2-2 Shahekou District Dalian Liaoning 116023 / CN | 05 /
WANG, Guang-Hui Wuyi Road Xueqingyuan-40-2-2 Shahekou District Dalian Liaoning 116023 / CN | 06 /
SUN, Tao Wuyi Road Xueqingyuan-40-2-2 Shahekou District Dalian Liaoning 116023 / CN | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Nobbe, Matthias Studiengesellschaft Kohle GmbH Kaiser-Wilhelm-Platz 1 45470 Mühlheim / DE | [2013/38] | Application number, filing date | 11788399.1 | 09.11.2011 | WO2011EP69719 | Priority number, date | DE20101050644 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010050644 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062793 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2638549 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/00 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
A61K49/1887 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (US);
B22F1/148 (EP,US);
B82Y25/00 (EP,US);
H01F1/0054 (EP,US);
H01F1/01 (US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2999/00, B22F1/054, B22F1/056, B22F1/148, B22F1/16 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/148, B22F1/054, B22F1/056, B22F1/16 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/148, B22F1/054, B22F1/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MIT KOHLENSTOFF GESCHÜTZTEN SUPERPARAMAGNETISCHEN ODER MAGNETISCHEN NANOKÜGELCHEN | [2013/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING CARBON PROTECTED SUPERPARAMAGNETIC OR MAGNETIC NANOSPHERES | [2013/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE NANOSPHÈRES MAGNÉTIQUES OU SUPRAMAGNÉTIQUES PROTÉGÉES PAR DU CARBONE | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI] - LU A-H ET AL, "Low temperature catalytic pyrolysis for the synthesis of high surface area, nanostructured graphitic carbon", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS 20060418 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY US, (20060418), vol. 18, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1021/CM060135P, pages 2086 - 2094, XP002665910 [X] 1,2,4-8,10-18 * page 2086, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2087, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2092, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [I] 3,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1021/CM060135P | [XI] - HYEON T ET AL, "High-performance direct methanol fuel cell electrodes using solid-phase-synthesized carbon nanocoils", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE - INTERNATIONAL EDITION 20030922 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DE, (20030922), vol. 42, no. 36, doi:DOI:10.1002/ANIE.200250856, pages 4352 - 4356, XP002665911 [X] 1,2,4-8,10,12-18 * page 4553, paragraph 3 * [I] 3,9,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1002/ANIE.200250856 | [XI] - CELORRIO V ET AL, "Study of the synthesis conditions of carbon nanocoils for energetic applications", ENERGY AND FUELS 20100617 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY USA, (20100617), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1021/EF9015119, pages 3361 - 3365, XP002665912 [X] 1,2,4-8,10,12-18 * page 3362, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 1, paragraph 5 * [I] 3,9,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1021/EF9015119 | [A] - ZALICH M A ET AL, "Structural and magnetic properties of oxidatively stable cobalt nanoparticles encapsulated in graphite shells", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS 20060530 AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY US, (20060530), vol. 18, no. 11, doi:DOI:10.1021/CM051346H, pages 2648 - 2655, XP002665913 [A] 1-18 * page 2648, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2649, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI:10.1021/CM051346H | by applicant | US2009047220 | - SUN ET AL., CHEM. MATER., (2006), vol. 18, pages 3486 - 3944 | - SEO ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (200612), vol. 5, pages 971 - 976 |