EP2579604 - RECEIVING DEVICE AND OUTPUT METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell, Ltd. 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8567 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell, Ltd. 1-88, Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8567 / JP | ||
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Hitachi Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEMARU, Takashi c/o Consumer Electronics Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 292 Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | 02 /
OTSUKA, Satoshi c/o Hitachi Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
TSURUGA, Sadao c/o Consumer Electronics Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 292 Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | [2013/16] |
Former [2013/15] | 01 /
KANEMARU, Takashi c/o Consumer Electronics Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 292 Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | ||
02 /
OTSUKA, Satoshi c/o Consumer Electronics Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 292 Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | |||
03 /
TSURUGA, Sadao c/o Consumer Electronics Laboratory HITACHI LTD. 292 Yoshida-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0817 / JP | Representative(s) | Addiss, John William, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11789373.5 | 28.03.2011 | WO2011JP01799 | Priority number, date | JP20100134650 | 14.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010134650 | JP20100126443 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010126443 | JP20100126442 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: JP 2010126442 | [2013/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011151958 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2579604 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/04 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
H04N13/139 (EP,US);
H04N13/178 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/194 (EP,US);
H04N13/356 (EP,US);
H04N2213/007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | EMPFANGSVORRICHTUNG UND AUSGABEVERFAHREN | [2013/15] | English: | RECEIVING DEVICE AND OUTPUT METHOD | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉCEPTION ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2012 | Translation filed | 23.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1737248 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0065] * [Y] 4,5,10,11 [I] 6,12; | [Y]WO2010041896 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [Y] 4,5,10,11 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0092] * | International search | [X]JP2006352876 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]WO2007148434 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al); | [A]JP2003333624 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH07274216 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH11191895 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XP]WO2010064448 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003090333 |