EP2575952 - PASSIVE SAFETY PORTAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smiths Medical ASD, Inc. 160 Weymouth Street Rockland, MA 02370 / US | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARTZ, Lori 6471 Tomahawk Court Lino Lakes, MN 55014 / US | 02 /
TRAVIS, Ronal, Gene 8094 Garfield St. NW Spring Lakes Park, MN 55432 / US | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 11790109.0 | 02.06.2011 | WO2011US00999 | Priority number, date | US20100801349 | 04.06.2010 Original published format: US 801349 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011152871 | Date: | 08.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2575952 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.04.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/02, A61M39/06, A61M39/20, A61M5/14, A61M5/158, A61M25/06, A61M5/162, A61M5/32 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A61M25/0618 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M5/1626 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/15] | A61M39/02, A61M39/06, A61M39/20, A61M5/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | PASSIVE SICHERHEITSPORTALVORRICHTUNG | [2013/15] | English: | PASSIVE SAFETY PORTAL DEVICE | [2013/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PORT À SÉCURITÉ PASSIVE | [2013/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 05.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US7597681 (SUTTON THOMAS K [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2005075609 (LATONA PATRICK C [US]) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US6719721 (OKAZAKI ELIZABETH [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US7438703 (BARRUS ROY L [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2007149920 (MICHELS LESTER D [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure - * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2007191771 (MOYER ROBERT [US]) [X] 1 * figures 2-5 * [Y] 2-15; | [XY]US2004133167 (FERGUSON F MARK [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 8 * [Y] 2-15 | International search | [X]US7597681 (SUTTON THOMAS K ET AL.); | [A]US2005075609 (PATRICK, C. LATONA); | [A]US6719721 (OKAZAKI ELIZABETH ET AL.); | [A]US7438703 (BARRUS ROY L. ET AL.); | [A]US2007149920 (MICHELS, L. D. ET AL.) |